Axiall Corp et al v. B N S F Railway Co et al
Plaintiff: Westlake Polymers LLC, Westlake Longview Corporation, Axiall LLC, Westlake Vinyls Inc., Westlake Styrene LLC, Westlake Petrochemicals LLC, Westlake Management Services Inc., Westlake Vinyls Company LP, WPT LLC, Axiall Corporation, Westlake Petrochemicals L L C, W P T L L C, Westlake Polymers L L C, Westlake Management Services Inc, Westlake Vinyls Inc, Axiall Corp, Axiall L L C, Westlake Vinyls Co L P, Westlake Longview Corp and Westlake Styrene L L C
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Union Pacific Railway Company, BNSF Railway Company, CSX Transportation Inc., B N S F Railway Co, Union Pacific Railway Co, C S X Transportation Inc and Norfolk Southern Railway Co
Case Number: 2:2019cv01272
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. All Defendants' Answer now due 12/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/15/2019. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
November 7, 2019 Filing 18 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by Axiall Corp, Axiall L L C, W P T L L C, Westlake Longview Corp, Westlake Management Services Inc, Westlake Petrochemicals L L C, Westlake Polymers L L C, Westlake Styrene L L C, Westlake Vinyls Co L P, Westlake Vinyls Inc. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Ieyoub, Christopher)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Robert P Vance, Jr for Axiall Corp, Axiall L L C, W P T L L C,Westlake Longview Corp, Westlake Management Services Inc, Westlake Petrochemicals L L C, Westlake Polymers L L C, Westlake Styrene L L C, Westlake Vinyls Co L P, Westlake Vinyls Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/5/2019. (crt,Williams, L)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Monica E Tarazi for Axiall Corp, Axiall L L C, W P T L L C,Westlake Longview Corp, Westlake Management Services Inc, Westlake Petrochemicals L L C, Westlake Polymers L L C, Westlake Styrene L L C, Westlake Vinyls Co L P, Westlake Vinyls Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/5/2019. (crt,Williams, L)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Sami H Rashid for Axiall L L C, W P T L L C,Westlake Longview Corp, Westlake Management Services Inc, Westlake Petrochemicals L L C,Westlake Polymers L L C, Westlake Styrene L L C Westlake Vinyls Co L P, Westlake Vinyls Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/5/2019. (crt,Williams, L)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Stephen R Neuwirth for Axiall Corp, Axiall L L C, W P T L L C, Westlake Longview Corp, Westlake Management Services Inc, Westlake Petrochemicals L L C, Westlake Polymers L L C, Westlake Styrene L L C, Westlake Vinyls Co L P, Westlake Vinyls Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/5/2019. (crt,Williams, L)
October 30, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Robert P. Vance, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-4088999) by Axiall Corp, Axiall L L C, W P T L L C, Westlake Longview Corp, Westlake Management Services Inc, Westlake Petrochemicals L L C, Westlake Polymers L L C, Westlake Styrene L L C, Westlake Vinyls Co L P, Westlake Vinyls Inc. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Ieyoub, Christopher)
October 30, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Monica E. Tarazi to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-4088995) by Axiall Corp, Axiall L L C, W P T L L C, Westlake Longview Corp, Westlake Management Services Inc, Westlake Petrochemicals L L C, Westlake Polymers L L C, Westlake Styrene L L C, Westlake Vinyls Co L P, Westlake Vinyls Inc. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Ieyoub, Christopher)
October 30, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Sami H. Rashid to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-4088989) by Axiall Corp, Axiall L L C, W P T L L C, Westlake Longview Corp, Westlake Management Services Inc, Westlake Petrochemicals L L C, Westlake Polymers L L C, Westlake Styrene L L C, Westlake Vinyls Co L P, Westlake Vinyls Inc. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Ieyoub, Christopher)
October 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Stephen R. Neuwirth to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-4088982) by Axiall Corp, Axiall L L C, W P T L L C, Westlake Longview Corp, Westlake Management Services Inc, Westlake Petrochemicals L L C, Westlake Polymers L L C, Westlake Styrene L L C, Westlake Vinyls Co L P, Westlake Vinyls Inc. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Ieyoub, Christopher)
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons - Complaint upon Union Pacific Railway Co served on Amy McLaren, Agent for Service of Process on 10/09/2019, filed by Axiall Corp, Axiall L L C, W P T L L C, Westlake Longview Corp, Westlake Management Services Inc, Westlake Petrochemicals L L C, Westlake Polymers L L C, Westlake Styrene L L C, Westlake Vinyls Co L P, Westlake Vinyls Inc. (aty,Ieyoub, Christopher)
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons - Complaint upon Norfolk Southern Railway Co served on Lynanne Gares, Agent for Service of Process on 10/09/2019, filed by Axiall Corp, Axiall L L C, W P T L L C, Westlake Longview Corp, Westlake Management Services Inc, Westlake Petrochemicals L L C, Westlake Polymers L L C, Westlake Styrene L L C, Westlake Vinyls Co L P, Westlake Vinyls Inc. (aty,Ieyoub, Christopher)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons - Complaint upon CSX Transportation Inc served on Amy McLaren, Agent for Service of Process on 10/09/2019, filed by Axiall Corp, Axiall L L C, W P T L L C, Westlake Longview Corp, Westlake Management Services Inc, Westlake Petrochemicals L L C, Westlake Polymers L L C, Westlake Styrene L L C, Westlake Vinyls Co L P, Westlake Vinyls Inc. (aty,Ieyoub, Christopher)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons - Complaint upon BNSF Railway Company served on Amy McLaren, Agent for Service of Process on 10/09/2019, filed by Axiall Corp, Axiall L L C, W P T L L C, Westlake Longview Corp, Westlake Management Services Inc, Westlake Petrochemicals L L C, Westlake Polymers L L C, Westlake Styrene L L C, Westlake Vinyls Co L P, Westlake Vinyls Inc. (aty,Ieyoub, Christopher)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. B N S F Railway Co., C S X Transportation Inc., Norfolk Southern Railway Co., and Union Pacific Railway Co answers due 11/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 10/29/2019. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint with consent by Axiall Corp, Axiall L L C, W P T L L C, Westlake Longview Corp, Westlake Management Services Inc, Westlake Petrochemicals L L C, Westlake Polymers L L C, Westlake Styrene L L C, Westlake Vinyls Co L P, Westlake Vinyls Inc. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Ieyoub, Christopher)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to B N S F Railway Co, C S X Transportation Inc, Norfolk Southern Railway Co and Union Pacific Railway Co. (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 30, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Axiall Corporation, Axiall LLC, WPT LLC, Westlake Longview Corporation, Westlake Management Services Inc., Westlake Petrochemicals LLC, Westlake Polymers LLC, Westlake Styrene LLC, Westlake Vinyls Company LP, Westlake Vinyls Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Westlake Chemical Corporation for Axiall Corporation, Axiall LLC, WPT LLC, Westlake Longview Corporation, Westlake Management Services Inc., Westlake Petrochemicals LLC, Westlake Polymers LLC, Westlake Styrene LLC, Westlake Vinyls Company LP, Westlake Vinyls Inc.. (aty,Ieyoub, Christopher)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against B N S F Railway Co, C S X Transportation Inc, Norfolk Southern Railway Co and Union Pacific Railway Co with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4062770) filed by Westlake Vinyls Inc, Axiall L L C, Westlake Petrochemicals L L C, Westlake Polymers L L C, Westlake Longview Corp, W P T L L C, Axiall Corp, Westlake Vinyls Co L P, Westlake Management Services Inc and Westlake Styrene L L C. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Christopher P Ieyoub added to party Axiall Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher P Ieyoub added to party Axiall LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher P Ieyoub added to party WPT LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher P Ieyoub added to party Westlake Longview Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher P Ieyoub added to party Westlake Management Services Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher P Ieyoub added to party Westlake Petrochemicals LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher P Ieyoub added to party Westlake Polymers LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher P Ieyoub added to party Westlake Styrene LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher P Ieyoub added to party Westlake Vinyls Company LP(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher P Ieyoub added to party Westlake Vinyls Inc.(pty:pla))(aty,Ieyoub, Christopher) Modified on 10/1/2019 to edit text (Dauterive, C). (Attachment 1 replaced with properly formatted pdf document on 10/1/2019) (Dauterive, C).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Axiall Corp et al v. B N S F Railway Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westlake Polymers LLC
Represented By: Christopher P Ieyoub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westlake Longview Corporation
Represented By: Christopher P Ieyoub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Axiall LLC
Represented By: Christopher P Ieyoub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westlake Vinyls Inc.
Represented By: Christopher P Ieyoub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westlake Styrene LLC
Represented By: Christopher P Ieyoub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westlake Petrochemicals LLC
Represented By: Christopher P Ieyoub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westlake Management Services Inc.
Represented By: Christopher P Ieyoub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westlake Vinyls Company LP
Represented By: Christopher P Ieyoub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WPT LLC
Represented By: Christopher P Ieyoub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Axiall Corporation
Represented By: Christopher P Ieyoub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westlake Petrochemicals L L C
Represented By: Sami H Rashid
Represented By: Stephen R Neuwirth
Represented By: Monica E Tarazi
Represented By: Christopher P Ieyoub
Represented By: Robert P Vance, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W P T L L C
Represented By: Sami H Rashid
Represented By: Stephen R Neuwirth
Represented By: Monica E Tarazi
Represented By: Christopher P Ieyoub
Represented By: Robert P Vance, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westlake Polymers L L C
Represented By: Sami H Rashid
Represented By: Stephen R Neuwirth
Represented By: Monica E Tarazi
Represented By: Christopher P Ieyoub
Represented By: Robert P Vance, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westlake Management Services Inc
Represented By: Sami H Rashid
Represented By: Stephen R Neuwirth
Represented By: Monica E Tarazi
Represented By: Christopher P Ieyoub
Represented By: Robert P Vance, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westlake Vinyls Inc
Represented By: Sami H Rashid
Represented By: Stephen R Neuwirth
Represented By: Monica E Tarazi
Represented By: Christopher P Ieyoub
Represented By: Robert P Vance, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Axiall Corp
Represented By: Sami H Rashid
Represented By: Stephen R Neuwirth
Represented By: Monica E Tarazi
Represented By: Christopher P Ieyoub
Represented By: Robert P Vance, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Axiall L L C
Represented By: Sami H Rashid
Represented By: Stephen R Neuwirth
Represented By: Monica E Tarazi
Represented By: Christopher P Ieyoub
Represented By: Robert P Vance, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westlake Vinyls Co L P
Represented By: Sami H Rashid
Represented By: Stephen R Neuwirth
Represented By: Monica E Tarazi
Represented By: Christopher P Ieyoub
Represented By: Robert P Vance, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westlake Longview Corp
Represented By: Sami H Rashid
Represented By: Stephen R Neuwirth
Represented By: Monica E Tarazi
Represented By: Christopher P Ieyoub
Represented By: Robert P Vance, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westlake Styrene L L C
Represented By: Sami H Rashid
Represented By: Stephen R Neuwirth
Represented By: Monica E Tarazi
Represented By: Christopher P Ieyoub
Represented By: Robert P Vance, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B N S F Railway Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railway Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C S X Transportation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?