Conner et al v. Chevron U S A Inc et al
Plaintiff: F. W. Conner Jr. Minerals, L.L.C., Francis W. Conner, Jr., State of Louisiana, F W Conner Jr Minerals L L C and Francis W Conner, Jr
Defendant: Vernon E Faulconer Inc, Hess Corp, L L O G Exploration Co L L C, Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Co, Hunt Oil Co, Chevron U S A Inc and Hilcorp Energy Co
Case Number: 2:2019cv01390
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 31 OPPOSITION to #26 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal filed by Francis W Conner, Jr, F W Conner Jr Minerals L L C, State of Louisiana. (aty,Owen, D) Modified text on 12/23/2019 (Dunford, T).
December 20, 2019 Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Remand with consent by Francis W Conner, Jr, F W Conner Jr Minerals L L C, State of Louisiana. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Certificate of No Opposition, #3 Proposed Order)(aty,Owen, D) Modified name of attachmenton 12/23/2019 (Dunford, T).
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #28 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Taylor Katherine Wimberly for Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 12/16/2019. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
December 13, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Taylor K. Wimberly to Enroll as Counsel by Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Co. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Geary, Covert)
December 12, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #26 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Crick, S)
December 11, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal with opposition by Chevron U S A Inc, Hess Corp. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Proposed pleading)(aty,Carrizales, Claudia) Modified on 12/12/2019 to modify docket entry relationship and docket text. (Crick, S).
December 11, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Remand filed by Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Co. (aty,Geary, Covert)
December 11, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Remand filed by Chevron U S A Inc, Hess Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,Carrizales, Claudia)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Continue. No defendant shall be required to file responsive pleadings, the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) conference shall be delayed and the obligations of the parties under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26 shall be delayed pending further instructions of the Court after the Plaintiffs' motion to remand has been litigated to conclusion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 12/4/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
November 27, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Continue Deadlines pending remand with consent by Chevron U S A Inc, Hess Corp. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Carrizales, Claudia)
November 21, 2019 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed filed in Case No. C-058719, 31st Judicial District Court, Jefferson Davis Parish, Louisiana. Hilcorp Energy Co answer due 11/1/2019; Hunt Oil Co answer due 11/1/2019; L L O G Exploration Co L L C answer due 11/1/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as pleading field within pdf of attachment to #21 Response to Removal Order. (crt,Crick, S)
November 21, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Chevron U S A Inc, Hess Corp . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit State Court Record)(aty,Carrizales, Claudia)
November 20, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #19 MOTION to Remand . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Crick, S)
November 20, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Remand by Francis W Conner, Jr, F W Conner Jr Minerals L L C, State of Louisiana. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Gerald Boelte, #4 Exhibit B - Excerpt of D&B report on LLOG)(aty,Owen, D) Modified on 11/20/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Vernon E Faulconer Inc answer due 12/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/5/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Co answer due 12/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/5/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Chevron U S A Inc answer due 12/4/2019; Hess Corp answer due 12/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/5/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
November 4, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hunt Oil Co identifying Corporate Parent Hunt Consolidated Hydrocarbons L L C for Hunt Oil Co. (aty,Zimmer, Scott)
November 1, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Vernon E Faulconer Inc. (aty,Jarrell, Charles)
November 1, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by Vernon E Faulconer Inc. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Jarrell, Charles)
November 1, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Co. (aty,Geary, Covert) Modified on 11/2/2019 to add filer and modify docket text. (Crick, S).
November 1, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Co. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Covert J Geary added to party Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Geary, Covert) Modified on 11/2/2019 to modify docket text and filer. (Crick, S).
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hilcorp Energy Co. (aty,Connick, Lorcan)
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chevron U S A Inc identifying Corporate Parent Chevron Corp for Chevron U S A Inc. (aty,Carrizales, Claudia)
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hess Corp. (aty,Wheeler, Elizabeth)
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Chevron U S A Inc, Hess Corp. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Carrizales, Claudia) Modified on 11/1/2019 to modify event to more accurately reflect document filed. (Crick, S).
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate L L O G Holdings L L C for L L O G Exploration Co L L C by L L O G Exploration Co L L C. (aty,Longman, Douglas) Modified on 11/2/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 10/29/2019. (crt,LaCombe, L)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Elizabeth S Wheeler, Erin Elizabeth Bambrick on behalf of Hess Corp. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/12/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Claudia Carrizales, Michael R Phillips, Claire Elizabeth Juneau, Louis V Gregoire, Jr, John C Funderburk on behalf of Chevron U S A Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/12/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
October 25, 2019 CONSENT TO REMOVAL by Hilcorp Energy Co. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #6 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
October 25, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thigpen, M)
October 25, 2019 CONSENT TO REMOVAL by Hunt Oil Co. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #6 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
October 25, 2019 CONSENT TO REMOVAL by Vernon E Faulconer Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #6 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
October 25, 2019 CONSENT TO REMOVAL by L L O G Exploration Co L L C. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #6 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
October 25, 2019 CONSENT TO REMOVAL by Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Co. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #6 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 31st JDC Jefferson Davis Parish, Case Number C-587-19 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4084837) filed by Hess Corp, Chevron U S A Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3 Part 1, #5 Exhibit 3 Part 2, #6 Exhibit 4)(Attorney Claudia Carrizales added to party Chevron U S A Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Carrizales, Claudia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conner et al v. Chevron U S A Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F. W. Conner Jr. Minerals, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis W. Conner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Louisiana
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: Wesley Alan Romero
Represented By: Leah Cotten Poole
Represented By: Caroline Hidalgo Martin
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: Christopher D Martin
Represented By: Matthew Patrick Keating
Represented By: Michael Keith Prudhomme
Represented By: Todd J Wimberley
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: David P Bruchhaus
Represented By: Chad E Mudd
Represented By: Ross J Donnes
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F W Conner Jr Minerals L L C
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: Wesley Alan Romero
Represented By: Leah Cotten Poole
Represented By: Caroline Hidalgo Martin
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: Christopher D Martin
Represented By: Matthew Patrick Keating
Represented By: Michael Keith Prudhomme
Represented By: Todd J Wimberley
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: David P Bruchhaus
Represented By: Chad E Mudd
Represented By: Ross J Donnes
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis W Conner, Jr
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: Wesley Alan Romero
Represented By: Leah Cotten Poole
Represented By: Caroline Hidalgo Martin
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: Christopher D Martin
Represented By: Matthew Patrick Keating
Represented By: Michael Keith Prudhomme
Represented By: Todd J Wimberley
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: David P Bruchhaus
Represented By: Chad E Mudd
Represented By: Ross J Donnes
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernon E Faulconer Inc
Represented By: Charles M Jarrell
Represented By: Gina Bradley Tuttle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Corp
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Bambrick
Represented By: Elizabeth S Wheeler
Represented By: Trinity A Morale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L L O G Exploration Co L L C
Represented By: Boyd A Bryan
Represented By: Carmen M Rodriguez
Represented By: Douglas C Longman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Co
Represented By: Lauren Courtney Mastio
Represented By: Taylor Katherine Wimberly
Represented By: Covert J Geary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunt Oil Co
Represented By: Katilyn M Hollowell
Represented By: Hattie Vaughn Guidry
Represented By: Esteban Herrera, Jr
Represented By: Albert M Hand, Jr
Represented By: Scott L Zimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U S A Inc
Represented By: Claudia Carrizales
Represented By: John C Funderburk
Represented By: Louis V Gregoire, Jr
Represented By: Claire Elizabeth Juneau
Represented By: Michael R Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilcorp Energy Co
Represented By: Lorcan L Connick
Represented By: Craig Isenberg
Represented By: David Niklaus Luder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?