Bates v. Meaux et al
Plaintiff: Kelly Bates
Defendant: Waitr Holdings Inc, Tilman J Fertitta, Jeff Yurecko, Richard Handler, Jefferies L L C, David Pringle, Jefferies Financial Group Inc and Christopher Meaux
Petitioner: Delivery Investor Group, Daniel Sinor, William Moore, Andrew Brown, Thomas Colangelo, Walter Welch and Sean Barnard
Case Number: 2:2019cv01427
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 19-1260 with consent sought but not yet obtained MOTION Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel filed by Sean Barnard, Delivery Investor Group, Walter Welch. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Melinda A. Nicholson, #2 Exhibit 1 - Form 10-K, #3 Exhibit 2 - Form 10-Q, #4 Exhibit 3 - Supplemental Joint Declaration of the DIG, #5 Exhibit 4 - Form S-3, #6 Exhibit 5 - Form S-3 Amendment, #7 Exhibit 6 - Merger Agreement, #8 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of Walter Welch, #9 Exhibit 8 - Declaration of Sean Barnard)(aty,Nicholson, Melinda)
December 27, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kelly Bates. Waitr Holdings Inc waiver sent on 12/19/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. (aty,O'Bell, Eric)
December 27, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kelly Bates. Tilman J Fertitta waiver sent on 12/19/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. (aty,O'Bell, Eric)
December 27, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kelly Bates. Richard Handler waiver sent on 12/19/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. (aty,O'Bell, Eric)
December 27, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kelly Bates. Jeff Yurecko waiver sent on 12/19/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. (aty,O'Bell, Eric)
December 27, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kelly Bates. David Pringle waiver sent on 12/19/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. (aty,O'Bell, Eric)
December 27, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kelly Bates. Christopher Meaux waiver sent on 12/19/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. (aty,O'Bell, Eric)
December 27, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kelly Bates. Jefferies Financial Group Inc waiver sent on 12/19/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. (aty,O'Bell, Eric)
December 27, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kelly Bates. Jefferies L L C waiver sent on 12/19/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. (aty,O'Bell, Eric)
December 4, 2019 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Eric J O'Bell on behalf of Kelly Bates regarding #8 Summons Returned Executed,. Action taken: docket text modified to reflect Summons Returned Unexecuted - Service of the complaint is not considered properly executed (service within the State of Louisiana cannot be effected through certified mail); therefore answer deadline has been terminated and serviced executed date removed. (crt,Bunting, M)
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted - Service of the complaint is not considered properly executed (service within the State of Louisiana cannot be effected through certified mail); therefore answer deadline has been terminated and serviced executed date removed by Kelly Bates. (aty,O'Bell, Eric) Modified to reflect unexecuted and to remove service date and answer due date on 12/4/2019 (Bunting, M).
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #6 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 19-1260 with consent sought but not yet obtained MOTION Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Bunting, M)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 19-1260 with consent sought but not yet obtained , MOTION Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel by Andrew Brown, Thomas Colangelo, Daniel Sinor, William Moore, Walter Welch, Sean Barnard. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief in Support, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Melinda A. Nicholson in Support of Motion, #3 Exhibit A - DIG Dec, #4 Exhibit B - Brown Cert, #5 Exhibit C - Sinor Cert, #6 Exhibit D - Moore Cert, #7 Exhibit E - Colangelo Cert, #8 Exhibit F - DIG Loss Chart, #9 Exhibit G - Welch Cert, #10 Exhibit H - Welch Loss Chart, #11 Exhibit I - Barnard Cert, #12 Exhibit J - Barnard Loss Chart, #13 Exhibit K - Notice, #14 Exhibit L - KSF Firm Resume, #15 Exhibit M - Lundy Firm Resume, #16 Proposed order)(Attorney Melinda A Nicholson added to party Andrew Brown(pty:mov), Attorney Melinda A Nicholson added to party Thomas Colangelo(pty:mov), Attorney Melinda A Nicholson added to party Daniel Sinor(pty:mov), Attorney Melinda A Nicholson added to party William Moore(pty:mov), Attorney Melinda A Nicholson added to party Walter Welch(pty:mov), Attorney Melinda A Nicholson added to party Sean Barnard(pty:mov))(aty,Nicholson, Melinda)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. In accordance with Standing Order 1.62, this matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Judge Terry A Doughty. Judge James D Cain, Jr no longer assigned to case. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment.(crt,Whidden, C)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER referring this matter to Chief Judge for reassignment (Public entry, but no electronic notice). Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 11/6/2019. (crt,Bunting, M)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED ORDER of recusal. Referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Bunting, M)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tilman J Fertitta, Richard Handler, Jefferies Financial Group Inc, Jefferies L L C, Christopher Meaux, David Pringle, Waitr Holdings Inc, Jeff Yurecko (crt,Bunting, M)
November 5, 2019 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to All Defendants, requested by Kelly Bates. (aty,O'Bell, Eric)
November 5, 2019 REFUND of $400.00 filing fee paid 11/04/2019, receipt #ALAWDC-4092554, has been completed this date; attorney requested to confirm this refund on next credit card statement (crt,Williams, C)
November 4, 2019 Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay added. (crt,Bunting, M)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tilman J Fertitta, Richard Handler, Jefferies Financial Group Inc, Jefferies L L C, Christopher Meaux, David Pringle, Waitr Holdings Inc, Jeff Yurecko with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4092612) filed by Kelly Bates. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Plaintiff, #2 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Eric J O'Bell added to party Kelly Bates(pty:pla))(aty,O'Bell, Eric) (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/5/2019) (Bunting, M). Modified docket text on 11/5/2019 (Bunting, M).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bates v. Meaux et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waitr Holdings Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tilman J Fertitta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Yurecko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Handler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferies L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Pringle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferies Financial Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Meaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Bates
Represented By: Eric J O'Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Delivery Investor Group
Represented By: Melinda A Nicholson
Represented By: Lewis S Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel Sinor
Represented By: Melinda A Nicholson
Represented By: Lewis S Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Moore
Represented By: Melinda A Nicholson
Represented By: Lewis S Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Andrew Brown
Represented By: Melinda A Nicholson
Represented By: Lewis S Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thomas Colangelo
Represented By: Melinda A Nicholson
Represented By: Lewis S Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Walter Welch
Represented By: Melinda A Nicholson
Represented By: Lewis S Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sean Barnard
Represented By: Melinda A Nicholson
Represented By: Lewis S Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?