Okeayainneh v. Dept of Justice et al
Plaintiff: Julian Okeayainneh
Defendant: Director/Chief of Human Resources Federal Bureau of Prisons, U S Dept of Justice and U S Attorney General
Case Number: 2:2019cv01482
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM ORDER: IT IS ORDERED THAT this matter be TRANSFERRED to a district of proper venue, the United States District Court for the District of Columbia, pursuant to 28 U.SC. 1406(a). The effect of this order is suspended for a period of fourteen (14) days to allow plaintiff an opportunity to object to this ruling with the District Court if he so chooses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 1/8/2020. (crt,Haik, K)
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST from Julian Okeayainneh for documentation reflecting account payment(s). Clerk mailed Case/Payment Inquiry Report along with copy of Docket Sheet on 01/03/2020. (Public entry, but no electronic notice.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Case Inquiry Report) (crt,Devillier, W)
December 17, 2019 REMARK: PLRA filing fee paid in full. Partial Filing Fee in the amount of $48.33, receipt number 54635063140, transferred to the outstanding PLRA fees owed in 2:19-cv-0150. (crt,McInnis, S)
December 16, 2019 RECEIVED Partial Filing Fee on behalf of Julian Okeayainneh in the amount of $48.33, receipt number 54635063140. (crt,Adams, K)
December 2, 2019 FILING FEE RECEIVED: on behalf of Julian Okeayainneh in the amount of $350.00, receipt number 54635063037.(crt,Reasor, M)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial Filing Fee due in the amount of $48.33. It is further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/26/2019. (crt,Haik, K) Modified to edit docket entry text on 12/2/2019 (Haik, K). Modified to correct signature date on 12/5/2019 (Haik, K).
November 14, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thigpen, M)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Julian Okeayainneh. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A) (Thigpen, M).
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U S Attorney General, U S Dept of Justice, Director/Chief of Human Resources Federal Bureau of Prisons filed by Julian Okeayainneh. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed summons/writ, #4 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Okeayainneh v. Dept of Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director/Chief of Human Resources Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Dept of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian Okeayainneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?