Bell v. Cascade Capital L L C et al
Plaintiff: Demetrius Bell
Defendant: Cascade Capital, LLC, Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc., Commonwealth Financial Systems Inc and Cascade Capital L L C
Case Number: 2:2019cv01559
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #3 Joint MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's claims against Defendants, Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc., and Cascade Capital, LLC. Responses due by 2/19/2020. defendant will then have 14 days to file a reply. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/31/2020. (crt,Jones, P)
January 31, 2020 Motions Transferred regarding #7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 Joint MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's claims against Defendants, Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc., and Cascade Capital, LLC with consent. Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. (crt,Bunting, M)
January 30, 2020 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 Joint MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's claims against Defendants, Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc., and Cascade Capital L L C with consent by Demetrius Bell, Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc, and Cascade Capital L L C. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Ford, Samuel) Modified filers on 1/31/2020 (Bunting, M).
January 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #3 Joint MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's claims against Defendants, Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc., and Cascade Capital, LLC. Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. Motion day set for 2/26/2020 before Judge James D Cain Jr. (crt,Bunting, M)
January 15, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cascade Capital L L C. (aty,Roth, Brian)
January 15, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Commonwealth Financial Systems Inc. (aty,Roth, Brian)
January 15, 2020 Filing 3 Joint MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by Cascade Capital L L C, Commonwealth Financial Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(Attorney Brian D Roth added to party Cascade Capital L L C(pty:dft) and Commonwealth Financial Systems Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Roth, Brian) Modified docket text on 1/15/2020 (Bunting, M).
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cascade Capital L L C, Commonwealth Financial Systems Inc (crt,Bunting, M)
December 5, 2019 Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay added. (crt,Bunting, M)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cascade Capital L L C and Commonwealth Financial Systems Inc with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4126046) filed by Demetrius Bell. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Proposed summons/writ, #3 Proposed summons/writ, #4 Exhibit A)(Attorney Samuel John Ford added to party Demetrius Bell(pty:pla))(aty,Ford, Samuel) Modified docket text on 12/6/2019 (Bunting, M).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Cascade Capital L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius Bell
Represented By: Samuel John Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cascade Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Financial Systems Inc
Represented By: Spencer M Schulz
Represented By: Bryan C Shartle
Represented By: Brian D Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cascade Capital L L C
Represented By: Spencer M Schulz
Represented By: Bryan C Shartle
Represented By: Brian D Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?