Baduria et al v. Sealift Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eufronio Jollado Baduria and Daniel Llagas
Defendant: Sealift Inc of Delaware, Sealift Tankships Inc, Remington Shipping Inc, Sealift L L C, Sagamore Shipping L L C, Sealift Holdings Inc, Fortune Maritime L L C, Sealift Inc and Black Eagle Shipping L L C
Case Number: 2:2020cv00417
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Lake Charles Office
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:1101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Filing 60 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/21/2020. Participating by telephone: Kenneth H. Hooks for Eufronio Jollado Baduria, Richard J. Dodson, Sr., for Danile Llagas, and Alan R. Davis for Sealift Holdings, Inc. Counsel agree that the issues in this matter transferred from EDNY are identical to those in our existing matter, Llagas v Sealift Holdings, 17-cv-472, and that the rulings in this matter with respect to the obligation of plaintiff Llagas to participate in arbitration in 17-cv-472 would apply equally to plaqintiff Baduria if litigated by him in this proceeding. Counsel will submit a stipulation to that effect suggesting this matter be held in abeyance in a manner similar to that in 17-cv-472 while the plaintiffs participate in arbitration. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ELECTRONIC ORDER: A Magistrate Judge Status Conference is set for 5/21/2020 at 2:00 PM by phone before Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Counsel for plaintiff is to initiate the phone conference to include all counsel of record and chambers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 5/6/2020. (crt,Solari, E)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 TRANSFER ORDER regarding admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 4/3/2020. (crt,Bunting, M)
April 2, 2020 Filing 57 PROPOSED TRANSFER ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay..Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/2/2020. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 2, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 2, 2020 Filing 56 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-00364. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Case transferred to District of Western District of Louisiana. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 4/2/2020. (Tirado, Chelsea) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting #47 Motion to Stay - Based on the foregoing, defendants' motion is GRANTED, and the action shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana where a parallel action is pending. SO Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 4/2/2020. (Tirado, Chelsea) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #54 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Daniel A Tadros and Ifigeneia Xanthopoulou terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 2/21/2020. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
February 20, 2020 Filing 54 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney D. Tadros & I. Xanthopoulou by Black Eagle Shipping, LLC, Fortune Maritime, LLC, Remington Shipping, Inc., Sagamore Shipping LLC, Sealift Holdings, Inc., Sealift Inc. of Delaware, Sealift Tankships, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Davis, Alan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER - Among the cases re-assigned to Judge Brown are cases where discovery schedules and/or conference dates have already been set by the District Judge. The parties are advised that, absent a specific order to the contrary, all previously established discovery deadlines remain in effect. Discovery is respectfully referred to the Magistrate Judge assigned to this case. Any conference scheduled to be held before the previously assigned District Judge is cancelled. SO Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 2/4/2020. (Tirado, Chelsea) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
January 28, 2020 Case Reassigned to Judge Gary R. Brown. Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (McMahon, Carol) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Motions referred to Arlene R. Lindsay. (Russo, Eric) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER: The status conference scheduled for 01/21/20 is adjourned to 04/21/20 at 11:15 a.m. in Courtroom 1010 of the Central Islip Courthouse. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 1/15/2020. c/ECF (Killigrew, Patricia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER re #47 Motion. Movant is directed to mail a courtesy copy of all motion papers of #47 Fully Briefed MOTION to Stay, Transfer or Dismiss to Magistrate Judge Brown's chambers forthwith. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 12/6/2019. c/ecf (Yim, Kevin) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER: The status conference scheduled for 10/24/19 is adjourned to 1/21/20 at 11:15 a.m. in courtroom 1010 of the Central Islip courthouse.Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 10/18/2019. (Disbrow, Sandra) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER Upon review of the parties' submissions and after consultation with Chief Judge Irizarry, Plaintiffs' request to reassign this matter as related to 05-cv-4659 is denied.Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 7/30/2019. (Disbrow, Sandra) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
June 18, 2019 Filing 52 Minute Entry for proceedings held on 6/18/2019 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein: Civil Cause for Initial Conference. Counsel for Plaintiff: Ralph Mallusi. Counsel for Defendant: Dan Tadros and Alan Davis. Case called. #47 Motion is referred to the assigned magistrate judge. A further status conference is scheduled before Judge Feuerstein on 10/24/2019 at 11:15AM. (Tirado, Chelsea) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Dodson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Dodson, Richard) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #50 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The initial conference scheduled for 5/23/19 is adjourned to 6/18/19 at 11:15 a.m. in courtroom 1010 of the Central Islip courthouse. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 5/7/2019. (Disbrow, Sandra) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 50 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Black Eagle Shipping, LLC, Fortune Maritime, LLC, Remington Shipping, Inc., Sagamore Shipping LLC, Sealift Holdings, Inc., Sealift Inc, Sealift Inc. of Delaware, Sealift LLC, Sealift Tankships, Inc. (Tadros, Daniel) Modified docket entry from letter to motion on 5/7/2019 (Tirado, Chelsea). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 49 Letter to defense re: initial conf. scheduling by Eufronio Jollado Baduria, Daniel Llagas (Hooks, Kenneth) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth H Hooks, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Hooks, Kenneth) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 47 Fully Briefed MOTION to Stay , Transfer or Dismiss by Black Eagle Shipping, LLC, Fortune Maritime, LLC, Remington Shipping, Inc., Sagamore Shipping LLC, Sealift Holdings, Inc., Sealift Inc, Sealift Inc. of Delaware, Sealift LLC, Sealift Tankships, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration Daniel A. Tadros, #3 Memorandum in Opposition, #4 Declaration Richard J. Dodson, #5 Memorandum in Support Reply Memorandum, #6 Declaration Alan R. Davis) (Davis, Alan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #46 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 3/20/2019. C/ECF (Johnston, Linda) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #45 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 3/20/2019. C/ECF (Johnston, Linda) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #44 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 3/20/2019. C/ECF (Johnston, Linda) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael A. Colomb Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11298584. by Eufronio Jollado Baduria. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit) (Mellusi, Ralph) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kenneth H. Hooks III Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11298542. by Eufronio Jollado Baduria. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit) (Mellusi, Ralph) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Richard J. Dodson Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11298450. by Eufronio Jollado Baduria. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit) (Mellusi, Ralph) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 43 Letter Confirming Delivery of Opposition Papers to Defense Counsel by Eufronio Jollado Baduria (Mellusi, Ralph) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 42 Letter Opposition of Consolidation by Black Eagle Shipping, LLC, Fortune Maritime, LLC, Remington Shipping, Inc., Sagamore Shipping LLC, Sealift Holdings, Inc., Sealift Inc, Sealift Inc. of Delaware, Sealift LLC, Sealift Tankships, Inc. (Davis, Alan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 41 Notice of Related Case Pursuant to Rule 50.3.1 (Mellusi, Ralph) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 40 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eufronio Jollado Baduria. Sealift Inc. of Delaware served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Shisha, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eufronio Jollado Baduria. Sealift Inc served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Shisha, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 38 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eufronio Jollado Baduria. Sealift Holdings, Inc. served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Shisha, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eufronio Jollado Baduria. Black Eagle Shipping, LLC served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Shisha, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eufronio Jollado Baduria. Fortune Maritime, LLC served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Shisha, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eufronio Jollado Baduria. Sagamore Shipping LLC served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Shisha, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eufronio Jollado Baduria. Sealift LLC served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Shisha, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eufronio Jollado Baduria. Sealift Tankships, Inc. served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Shisha, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eufronio Jollado Baduria. Remington Shipping, Inc. served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Shisha, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 31 Letter by Black Eagle Shipping, LLC, Fortune Maritime, LLC, Remington Shipping, Inc., Sagamore Shipping LLC, Sealift Holdings, Inc., Sealift Inc, Sealift Inc. of Delaware, Sealift LLC, Sealift Tankships, Inc. (Tadros, Daniel) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Ifigeneia Xanthopoulou on behalf of Black Eagle Shipping, LLC, Fortune Maritime, LLC, Remington Shipping, Inc., Sagamore Shipping LLC, Sealift Holdings, Inc., Sealift Inc, Sealift Inc. of Delaware, Sealift LLC, Sealift Tankships, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Xanthopoulou, Ifigeneia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan R Davis on behalf of Black Eagle Shipping, LLC, Fortune Maritime, LLC, Remington Shipping, Inc., Sagamore Shipping LLC, Sealift Holdings, Inc., Sealift Inc, Sealift Inc. of Delaware, Sealift LLC, Sealift Tankships, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Davis, Alan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A Tadros on behalf of Black Eagle Shipping, LLC, Fortune Maritime, LLC, Remington Shipping, Inc., Sagamore Shipping LLC, Sealift Holdings, Inc., Sealift Inc, Sealift Inc. of Delaware, Sealift LLC, Sealift Tankships, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Tadros, Daniel) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 2/19/2019. C/ECF (Johnston, Linda) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 2/19/2019. C/ECF (Johnston, Linda) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 2/19/2019. C/ECF (Johnston, Linda) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Alan R. Davis Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11205364. by Sealift Holdings, Inc., Sealift Inc, Sealift Inc. of Delaware, Sealift LLC, Sealift Tankships, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit) (Davis, Alan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel A. Tadros Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11205301. by Sealift Holdings, Inc., Sealift Inc, Sealift Inc. of Delaware, Sealift LLC, Sealift Tankships, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit) (Tadros, Daniel) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ifigeneia Xanthopoulou Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11205057. by Sealift Holdings, Inc., Sealift Inc, Sealift Inc. of Delaware, Sealift LLC, Sealift Tankships, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit) (Xanthopoulou, Ifigeneia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
January 30, 2019 Filing 24 Summons Issued as to Black Eagle Shipping, LLC, Fortune Maritime, LLC, Remington Shipping, Inc., Sagamore Shipping LLC, Sealift Holdings, Inc., Sealift Inc, Sealift Inc. of Delaware, Sealift LLC, Sealift Tankships, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Fortune Maritime LLC, #2 Summons as to Remington Shipping, Inc, #3 Summons as to Sagamore Shipping, Inc, #4 Summons as to Sealift Holdings, Inc, #5 Summons as to Sealift Inc. of Delaware, #6 Summons as to Sealift, Inc., #7 Summons as to Sealift, LLC, #8 Summons as to Sealift Tankships, Inc.) (Tirado, Chelsea) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
January 29, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 5/23/2019 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff(s) shall serve a copy of this Notice of Hearing upon defendant(s) and file proof of such service with the Court. c/ECF. (Disbrow, Sandra) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 23 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Eufronio Jollado Baduria (Shisha, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 22 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Eufronio Jollado Baduria (Shisha, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 21 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Eufronio Jollado Baduria (Shisha, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 20 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Eufronio Jollado Baduria (Shisha, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 19 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Eufronio Jollado Baduria (Shisha, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 18 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Eufronio Jollado Baduria (Shisha, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 17 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Eufronio Jollado Baduria (Shisha, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 16 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Eufronio Jollado Baduria (Shisha, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 15 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Eufronio Jollado Baduria (Shisha, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
January 25, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Related Case indicated on the civil cover sheet in case number 19cv364. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
January 25, 2019 Filing 13 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
January 25, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
January 25, 2019 Proposed summonses are rejected; the caption on the summonses do not match the caption of the complaint; specifically, if you use "et al" you must attach a rider; the Clerk's Office cannot issue the summonses with an incorrect caption. Counsel is advised to submit completed proposed summonses using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
January 25, 2019 Filing 12 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/25/2019: #1 Additional Corrections) (Rodin, Deanna). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
January 25, 2019 Filing 11 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Eufronio Jollado Baduria (Shisha, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
January 25, 2019 NOTICE - the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet (MISSING SECOND PAGE FORM). Counsel is directed to forward a completed Civil Cover Sheet, answering all questions in *** NY-E DIVISION OF BUSINESS RULE 50.1(d)(2) and CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY *** section on the second page. This document can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Eufronio Jollado Baduria (Shisha, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Eufronio Jollado Baduria (Shisha, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Eufronio Jollado Baduria (Shisha, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Eufronio Jollado Baduria (Shisha, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Eufronio Jollado Baduria (Shisha, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Eufronio Jollado Baduria (Shisha, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Eufronio Jollado Baduria (Shisha, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Eufronio Jollado Baduria (Shisha, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Eufronio Jollado Baduria (Shisha, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11116701 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Eufronio Jollado Baduria. (Shisha, Jacob) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/2/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baduria et al v. Sealift Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sealift Inc of Delaware
Represented By: Alan R Davis
Represented By: Ifigeneia Xanthopoulou
Represented By: Daniel A Tadros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sealift Tankships Inc
Represented By: Alan R Davis
Represented By: Ifigeneia Xanthopoulou
Represented By: Daniel A Tadros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remington Shipping Inc
Represented By: Alan R Davis
Represented By: Ifigeneia Xanthopoulou
Represented By: Daniel A Tadros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sealift L L C
Represented By: Alan R Davis
Represented By: Ifigeneia Xanthopoulou
Represented By: Daniel A Tadros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sagamore Shipping L L C
Represented By: Alan R Davis
Represented By: Ifigeneia Xanthopoulou
Represented By: Daniel A Tadros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sealift Holdings Inc
Represented By: Alan R Davis
Represented By: Ifigeneia Xanthopoulou
Represented By: Daniel A Tadros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fortune Maritime L L C
Represented By: Alan R Davis
Represented By: Ifigeneia Xanthopoulou
Represented By: Daniel A Tadros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sealift Inc
Represented By: Alan R Davis
Represented By: Ifigeneia Xanthopoulou
Represented By: Daniel A Tadros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Eagle Shipping L L C
Represented By: Alan R Davis
Represented By: Ifigeneia Xanthopoulou
Represented By: Daniel A Tadros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eufronio Jollado Baduria
Represented By: Kenneth H Hooks, III
Represented By: Jacob Shisha
Represented By: Richard J Dodson, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Llagas
Represented By: Kenneth H Hooks, III
Represented By: Jacob Shisha
Represented By: Richard J Dodson, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?