Norwood et al v. Albertsons Companies Inc Louisiana et al
Plaintiff: Erica Norwood and Eric Norwood
Defendant: Albertson's LLC, McKesson Pharmacy Systems LLC, Albertson's, Inc., Albertsons Companies, Inc. Louisiana, PDX, Inc., Albertsons Inc, Albertsons L L C, McKesson Pharmacy Systems L L C, Albertsons Companies Inc, Albertsons Companies Inc Louisiana and P D X Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00468
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Albertsons Companies Inc. (aty,Wolff, John)
June 4, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to John Powers Wolff, III on behalf of Albertsons Companies Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/18/2020. (crt,Miletello, A)
June 3, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #11 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Albertsons Companies Inc.(Attorney John Powers Wolff, III added to party Albertsons Companies Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Wolff, John) Modified on 6/4/2020 to create docket entry relationship and modify docket text (Miletello, A).
June 2, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by P D X Inc.(aty,Bogart, Kelly)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss Albertsons Companies Inc Louisiana, Albertson L L C, Albertsons Inc, McKesson Pharmacy Systems L L C. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 5/15/2020. (crt,Williams, L)
May 15, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by P D X Inc identifying Corporate Parent National Health Coalition Inc for P D X Inc. (aty,Bogart, Kelly)
May 14, 2020 Filing 13 VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss Albertsons Companies Inc Louisiana, Albertson L L C, Albertsons Inc, McKesson Pharmacy Systems L L C by Eric Norwood, Erica Norwood. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Soileau, Rudie) Modified on 5/15/2020 to modify docket text (MiletelloSld, A).
May 14, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Albertsons Companies Inc. (crt,MiletelloSld, A)
May 14, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Albertsons Companies Inc Louisiana, Albertsons Inc, Albertsons L L C, McKesson Pharmacy Systems L L C, P D X Inc, Albertsons Companies Inc filed by Eric Norwood, Erica Norwood.(crt,MiletelloSld, A)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 5/14/2020. (crt,MiletelloSld, A)
May 13, 2020 Motions Transferred regarding #9 MOTION to Amend/Correct. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Amend/Correct. (Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/13/2020.) (crt,MiletelloSld, A)
May 13, 2020 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Rudie Ray Soileau, Jr on behalf of Eric Norwood, Erica Norwood regarding #9 Amended Complaint. Action taken: Modified entry to more accurately identify the pleading submitted as Motion to Amend. (crt,MiletelloSld, A)
May 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend #1 COMPLAINT by Eric Norwood, Erica Norwood. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Soileau, Rudie) Modified on 5/13/2020 to capture motion event, create docket entry relationship and modify docket text (MiletelloSld, A).
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. McKesson Pharmacy Systems, LLC, answer due 6/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 5/4/2020. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. PDX, Inc., answer due 6/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 5/4/2020. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
May 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to Kelly C Bogart on behalf of P D X Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/15/2020. (crt,MiletelloSld, A)
May 1, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent by P D X Inc. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Kelly C Bogart added to party P D X Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Bogart, Kelly) Modified on 5/1/2020 to modify docket text (MiletelloSld, A).
May 1, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to W Michael Adams on behalf of McKesson Pharmacy Systems L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/15/2020. (crt,MiletelloSld, A)
May 1, 2020 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by McKesson Pharmacy Systems L L C. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney W Michael Adams added to party McKesson Pharmacy Systems L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Adams, W) Modified on 5/1/2020 to modify docket text (MiletelloSld, A).
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Albertsons Companies Inc Louisiana, Albertsons Inc, Albertsons L L C, McKesson Pharmacy Systems L L C, P D X Inc. (crt,MiletelloSld, A)
April 15, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,MiletelloSld, A)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Albertsons Companies Inc Louisiana, Albertsons L L C, Albertsons Inc, McKesson Pharmacy Systems L L C, P D X Inc (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4236576) filed by Eric Norwood, Erica Norwood. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Civil cover sheet Attachment)(Attorney Rudie Ray Soileau, Jr added to party Eric Norwood(pty:pla), Erica Norwood(pty:pla))(aty,Soileau, Rudie) (Attachment 1 replaced and modified docket text on 4/16/2020) (MiletelloSld, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norwood et al v. Albertsons Companies Inc Louisiana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertson's LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Pharmacy Systems LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertson's, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertsons Companies, Inc. Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PDX, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertsons Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertsons L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Pharmacy Systems L L C
Represented By: Stacey D Williams
Represented By: W Michael Adams
Represented By: Timothy Russell Wynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertsons Companies Inc
Represented By: Chad Anthony Sullivan
Represented By: Tori Sherer Bowling
Represented By: John Powers Wolff, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertsons Companies Inc Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P D X Inc
Represented By: Kelly C Bogart
Represented By: Laura Len Pousson
Represented By: Nicole Marie Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Norwood
Represented By: Rudie Ray Soileau, Jr
Represented By: Hunter W Lundy
Represented By: Daniel A Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Norwood
Represented By: Rudie Ray Soileau, Jr
Represented By: Hunter W Lundy
Represented By: Daniel A Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?