Srilamsingha v. Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C et al
Plaintiff: Suree Srilamsingha
Defendant: Lillies Asian Cuisine Restaurant, Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C and Landrys Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00668
Filed: May 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Filing 13 PROPOSED TRANSFER ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/27/2020. (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 27, 2020 Filing 12 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00897. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Transferring Case. This case is transferred, under 28 U.S.C. Sections 1406 & 1631, to theUnited States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana, LakeCharles division. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/27/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Denying Remand. Suree Srilamsingha's motion to remand is denied #6 . (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/27/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Interdistrict transfer to WD/LA - Lake Charles Div. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 5/27/20, filed. (sanderson, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/27/2020.]
May 27, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Dismissing Party. Landry's is dismissed from this lawsuit as improvidently joined. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/27/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #6 First MOTION to Remand filed by Golden Nugget Lake Charles, LLC, Landry's Inc., Lillie's Asian Cuisine Restaurant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Perkins, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/27/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order: Initial Conference set for 6/15/2020 at 11:00 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/27/2020.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 6 First MOTION to Remand by Suree Srilamsingha, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/1/2020. (McKinnon, Angela) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/27/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 5 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Golden Nugget Lake Charles, LLC, Landry's Inc., Lillie's Asian Cuisine Restaurant, filed.(Perkins, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/27/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b) or in the alternative to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 USC 1406 by Golden Nugget Lake Charles, LLC, Lillie's Asian Cuisine Restaurant, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Perkins, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/27/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/27/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE to State Court and All Parties of Filing of Notice of Removal by Golden Nugget Lake Charles, LLC, Lillie's Asian Cuisine Restaurant, filed. (Perkins, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/27/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 164th Harris County, case number 2020-07370 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24386398) filed by Lillie's Asian Cuisine Restaurant, Golden Nugget Lake Charles, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Perkins, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/27/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Srilamsingha v. Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lillies Asian Cuisine Restaurant
Represented By: R Edward Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C
Represented By: R Edward Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landrys Inc
Represented By: R Edward Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suree Srilamsingha
Represented By: Angela Reese McKinnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?