Clark et al v. Southern Energy Homes Inc et al
Plaintiff: James Michael Clark and serena Croxdale clark
Defendant: cmh homes, inc., southern energy homes, inc., C M H Homes Inc and Southern Energy Homes Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00762
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 NOTICE of Corrective Action to James R Morris on behalf of James Michael Clark regarding #3 Waiver of Service Executed,. Action taken: Modified docket text to indicate date of mailing of waiver to C M H Homes Inc, Southern Energy Homes Inc and to indicate answer due date. (crt,Crick, S)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by James Michael Clark. Waiver mailed to C M H Homes Inc, Southern Energy Homes Inc on 6/19/2020; answer due 08/18/2020. (aty,Morris, James) Modified on 6/26/2020 to add date of mailing and answer due date. (Crick, S).
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to C M H Homes Inc, Southern Energy Homes Inc. (crt,Williams, L)
June 17, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Dauterive, C)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Southern Energy Homes Inc and C M H Homes Inc with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4295689) filed by James Michael Clark and Serena Croxdale Clark. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney James R Morris added to party James Michael Clark(pty:pla))(aty,Morris, James) Modified on 6/18/2020 to edit text (Dauterive, C).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark et al v. Southern Energy Homes Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Michael Clark
Represented By: James R Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: serena Croxdale clark
Represented By: James R Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cmh homes, inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: southern energy homes, inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C M H Homes Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Energy Homes Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?