LeBouef v. GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co
Plaintiff: Denese LeBouef
Defendant: GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company and GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co
Case Number: 2:2020cv00814
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Remand to Clerk of 14th Judicial District Court for Calcasieu Parish. (crt,Benoit, T)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 7/27/2020. (crt,Benoit, T)
July 24, 2020 Motions Transferred regarding #10 MOTION to Remand . Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. (crt,Jones, P)
July 24, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand by Denese LeBouef. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Burgess, Roger)
July 23, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co, Denese LeBouef. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,Reimonenq, Simeon) Modified on 7/23/2020 to add filer (Jones, P).
July 8, 2020 Filing 8 ISSUED IN ERROR - NOTICE of Deficiency to Simeon B Reimonenq, Jr on behalf of GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co regarding #6 Amended Answer to Complaint. Reason: Leave of court is required for the filing of this supplemental pleading. Please refer to Fed.R.Civ.P. 15(d) regarding supplemental pleadings for additional information. (crt,Jones, P) Modified on 7/8/2020 to indicate issued in error (Jones, P).
July 8, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent GeoVera Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent GeoVera Insurance Holdings, Ltd. for GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Reimonenq, Simeon)
July 8, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED ANSWER to Petition for Breach of Contract, Bad Faith, Penalties and Attorney's Fees #1 Notice of Removal, by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Reimonenq, Simeon) Modified on 7/8/2020 to indicate deficiency (Jones, P). Modified on 7/8/2020 to remove deficiency (Jones, P).
July 2, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co.(aty,Reimonenq, Simeon)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 6/29/2020. (crt,LaCombe, L)
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/26/2020. (crt,Thigpen, M)
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Simeon B Reimonenq, Jr, Seth A Schmeeckle on behalf of GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/10/2020. (crt,Thigpen, M)
June 25, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thigpen, M)
June 25, 2020 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company answer due 7/2/2020. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #2 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2020-1116 (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4304747) filed by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Notice, #4 Exhibit D - Listing, #5 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Simeon B Reimonenq, Jr added to party GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft))(aty,Reimonenq, Simeon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LeBouef v. GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Simeon B Reimonenq, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co
Represented By: Seth A Schmeeckle
Represented By: Simeon B Reimonenq, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denese LeBouef
Represented By: Roger Glenn Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?