Craft v. Parish of Jeff Davis et al
Plaintiff: Jason Craft
Defendant: John Kurtz, Parish of Jeff Davis, Ivy Woods, Dustin Locke and Jason Cartwright
Case Number: 2:2020cv00853
Filed: July 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Parish of Jeff Davis. Parish of Jeff Davis waiver sent on 7/8/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Attorney David P Bruchhaus added to party Parish of Jeff Davis(pty:dft)) (aty,Bruchhaus, David)
July 6, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jason Cartwright, Parish of Jeff Davis, John Kurtz, Dustin Locke and Ivy Woods. (crt,Dauterive, C)
July 3, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Dauterive, C)
July 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jason Cartwright, Parish of Jeff Davis, John Kurtz, Dustin Locke and Ivy Woods with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4312444) filed by Jason Craft. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Pride J Doran added to party Jason Craft(pty:selreq))(aty,Doran, Pride) Modified on 7/6/2020 to add filers (Dauterive, C).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craft v. Parish of Jeff Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parish of Jeff Davis
Represented By: David P Bruchhaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivy Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Locke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Cartwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Craft
Represented By: Quincy L Cawthorne
Represented By: Pride J Doran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?