Terrebonne v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Steven Paul Terrebonne
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2020cv00892
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 DISTRICT COURT TRANSFER Record Received electronically by Eastern District of Louisiana on 7/20/2020, assigned case number 2:20-cv-02050. (crt,Whidden, C)
July 20, 2020 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from Western District of Louisiana to Eastern District of Louisiana. Case Terminated. All future pleadings should be filed with the newly assigned court. (crt,Taylor, L)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 7/17/2020. (crt,Taylor, L)
July 16, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S.D.C. Eastern District of Louisiana. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/16/2020. (crt,Reeves, T)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S.D.C. Eastern District of Louisiana by Steven Paul Terrebonne. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Misko, Benjamin)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Deficiency to Benjamin M Misko on behalf of Steven Paul Terrebonne regarding #4 DEFICIENT? MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S.D.C. Eastern District of Louisiana. Reason: Either no proposed order accompanied this motion or the proposed order was not on a separate page. Please see LR7.4.1 or LR58.1 for additional information. The motion cannot be referred to chambers until this deficiency is corrected. (crt,Taylor, L)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 DEFICIENT MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S.D.C. Eastern District of Louisiana by Steven Paul Terrebonne. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (aty,Misko, Benjamin) Modified on 7/16/2020 to reflect submission as Deficient (Taylor, L). Modified on 7/17/2020 to terminate motion - see doc #6 Motion to Transfer Case w/proposed Order (Taylor, L).
July 15, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Dauterive, C)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Edward A. Wicklundto Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4323461) by Steven Paul Terrebonne. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(aty,Misko, Benjamin)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Steven Paul Terrebonne. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Misko, Benjamin)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (In Forma Pauperis status requested and/or granted) filed by Steven Paul Terrebonne. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Attorney Benjamin M Misko added to party Steven Paul Terrebonne(pty:pla))(aty,Misko, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terrebonne v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Paul Terrebonne
Represented By: Benjamin M Misko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?