Curry v. Jasper et al
Plaintiff: Vickie Curry
Defendant: Landstar Ranger Inc and Gayle A Jasper
Case Number: 2:2020cv01145
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 JUDGMENT in accordance with the #39 Memorandum Ruling, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss [doc. 34] be GRANTED and that this matter be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1). Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 10/15/2020. (crt,Benoit, T)
October 15, 2020 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM RULING re #34 VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss filed by Vickie Curry. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 10/15/2020. (crt,Benoit, T)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Evan J Weems added as counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 10/14/2020. (crt,Thomas, T)
October 8, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Evan J. Weems to Enroll as Counsel by Vickie Curry. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Evan J Weems added to party Vickie Curry(pty:pla))(aty,Weems, Evan)
October 2, 2020 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #34 JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice filed by Gayle A Jasper, Landstar Ranger Inc. (aty,Kirsch, Kyle)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re #34 JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss filed by Vickie Curry. Set Deadlines as to #34 JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss, Responses due by 10/5/2020 Replies due by 10/9/2020. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 9/29/2020. (crt,Benoit, T)
September 25, 2020 Motions Transferred regarding #34 JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss. Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. (crt,Crawford, A)
September 25, 2020 Filing 34 VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss and Withdraw Without Prejudice by Vickie Curry. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(crt,Crawford, A)
September 24, 2020 Filing 33 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Landstar Ranger Inc identifying Corporate Parent Landstar System Holdings, Inc. for Landstar Ranger Inc. (aty,Kirsch, Kyle)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #20 Motion for Reconsideration of #18 Memorandum & Opinion and #19 Order transferring this matter from the Northern District of Alabama to this court and denying #20 the Motion to Transfer Case to Florida. Having reviewed the opinion of the Magistrate Judge in Alabama, plaintiff's motion, and defendant's opposition, we agree with the defendant that plaintiff has failed to provide any argument or authority on why we should review the decision of the Alabama court but nevertheless we have reviewed it and find it correct and unassailable. Just as she did in her opposition filed in Alabama, plaintiff incorrectly conflates issues of personal jurisdiction and venue. Accordingly the request for reconsideration is DENIED.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 9/22/2020. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
September 21, 2020 Filing 31 SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re: #22 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to Kyle P Kirsch, Sara Lynn Braslow on behalf of Landstar Ranger Inc. Show Cause Response due by 10/5/2020. (crt,Mitchell, P)
September 17, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #29 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Motion day set for 10/28/2020 before Judge James D Cain Jr. (crt,Thomas, T)
September 17, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by Gayle A Jasper, Landstar Ranger Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,Kirsch, Kyle) Modified to correct event type and edit docket text on 9/17/2020 (Thomas, T).
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Sara Lynn Levy Braslow and Kyle P. Kirsch for Gayle A Jasper and Landstar Ranger Inc. Attorney Dennis Oscar Vann terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 9/15/2020. (crt,Thomas, T)
September 14, 2020 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #20 MOTION for Reconsideration MOTION to Transfer Case to Florida filed by Gayle A Jasper, Landstar Ranger Inc. (aty,Kirsch, Kyle)
September 14, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Kyle P. Kirsch and Sara L. Braslow in place of Robert A. Arnwine, Jr Thomas L. Oliver, II and Dennis O. Vann, Jr. with consent by Gayle A Jasper, Landstar Ranger Inc. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Kyle P Kirsch added to party Gayle A Jasper(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle P Kirsch added to party Landstar Ranger Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Kirsch, Kyle) Modified to edit docket text on 9/14/2020 (Thomas, T).
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TRANSFER ORDER regarding admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 9/8/2020. (crt,Crawford, A)
September 3, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #20 MOTION for Reconsideration, MOTION to Transfer Case to Florida. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thomas, T)
September 3, 2020 Filing 23 PROPOSED TRANSFER ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/3/2020. (crt,Thomas, T)
September 3, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #7 Motion to Dismiss, sent to Dennis Oscar Vann on behalf of Landstar Ranger Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/17/2020. (crt,Thomas, T)
September 3, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thomas, T)
September 3, 2020 Filing 21 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 7:20-cv-00153. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
August 25, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Reconsideration, Alternatively, MOTION to Transfer Case to Florida by Vickie Curry. (McMath, Byron) Modified on 8/25/2020 (KAM, ). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 9/3/2020.] Modified to correct event type, add motion event and to edit docket text on 9/3/2020 (Thomas, T). Modified to indicate memorandum incorporated within the motion on 9/3/2020 (Thomas, T).
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER in accordance with the Memo Opn entered contemporaneously, the Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion to Transfer #7 is GRANTED; ORDER transferring case to the District of Western Louisiana; original electronic record will be electronically transferred to Clerk of Court 10 business days from this date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 8/14/2020. (KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 9/3/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 8/14/2020. (KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 9/3/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 4/2/20. (MRR, ) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 9/3/2020.]
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: As the parties have unanimously consented to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge, the consent conference scheduled for April 8, 2020 is CANCELED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 04/01/2020. (RCP) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 9/3/2020.]
April 1, 2020 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge (MRR, ) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 9/3/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY Brief filed by Defendants Gayle A Jasper, Landstar Ranger Inc re: #8 Brief, #7 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion to Transfer filed by Gayle A Jasper, Landstar Ranger Inc. (Oliver, Thomas) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 9/3/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion to Transfer filed by Vickie Curry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_B_C)(McMath, Byron) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 9/3/2020.]
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Joinder. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 3/16/2020. (RCP) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 9/3/2020.]
March 16, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Joinder in Motion to Dismiss, or, in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer by Gayle A Jasper. (Oliver, Thomas) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 9/3/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER; Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than April 16, 2020. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a District Judge without further Order after April 16, 2020. A Telephone Status Conference is hereby SET for Wednesday, April 8, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. The Status Conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 3/6/2020. (JLC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 9/3/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion to Transfer. Responses due on or before March 20, 2020. Replies due on or before March 27, 2020. (JLC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 9/3/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER re #7 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion to Transfer filed by Landstar Ranger, Inc. Plaintiff shall file a response to the motion (Doc. 7) on or before March 20, 2020, and the moving defendant may file a reply in support of its motion on or before March 27, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 3/6/2020. (RCP) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 9/3/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 8 Brief re #7 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion to Transfer filed by Landstar Ranger Inc. (Oliver, Thomas) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 9/3/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion to Transfer by Landstar Ranger Inc. (Oliver, Thomas) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 9/3/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Gayle A Jasper served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (MRR, ) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 9/3/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Landstar Ranger Inc served on 2/10/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. (MRR, ) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 9/3/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Gayle A Jasper, Landstar Ranger Inc., sent via certified mail (MRR, ) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 9/3/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Vickie Curry. (MRR, ) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 9/3/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3528757 (B4601103805). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Gayle A Jasper, Landstar Ranger Inc, filed by Vickie Curry.(MRR, ). (McMath, Byron) Modified on 2/5/2020 (MRR, ). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 9/3/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, ) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 9/3/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gayle A Jasper, Landstar Ranger Inc, filed by Vickie Curry.(MRR, ) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 9/3/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curry v. Jasper et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landstar Ranger Inc
Represented By: Dennis Oscar Vann
Represented By: Kyle P Kirsch
Represented By: Sara Lynn Braslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gayle A Jasper
Represented By: Dennis Oscar Vann
Represented By: Kyle P Kirsch
Represented By: Sara Lynn Braslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie Curry
Represented By: Byron G McMath
Represented By: Evan J Weems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?