Johnson v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co
Plaintiff: Tami Johnson
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Co
Special Master: Cade Richard Cole and Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Case Number: 2:2021cv00648
Filed: March 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co.(aty,Thibodeaux, Taylor)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, State Farm Fire & Casualty Co answer due 5/4/2021. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 4/13/2021. (crt,Benoit, T)
April 9, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co for State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (aty,Thibodeaux, Taylor) Modified on 4/9/2021 to modify docket text (Miletello, A).
April 9, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Taylor A Thibodeaux added to party State Farm Fire & Casualty Co(pty:dft))(aty,Thibodeaux, Taylor)
March 26, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tami Johnson. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co served on 3/19/21; State Farm Fire & Casualty Co answer due 4/9/21. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as document electronically filed in error as 5 Acknowledgment of Service. (crt,Crick, S) Modified on 3/26/2021 to add document number. (Crick, S).
March 15, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (crt,Miletello, A)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Miletello, A)
March 15, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Tami Johnson. (aty,Hill, Craig)
March 12, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Miletello, A)
March 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State Farm Fire & Casualty Co (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4604868) filed by Tami Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet - See Doc #2 )(Attorney Craig Ray Hill added to party Tami Johnson(pty:pla))(aty,Hill, Craig) Modified on 3/12/2021 to modify docket text (Miletello, A). Modified on 3/15/2021 to modify docket text (Miletello, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Co
Represented By: V Ed McGuire, III
Represented By: Christopher P Ieyoub
Represented By: Taylor A Thibodeaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tami Johnson
Represented By: John Craig Jones
Represented By: Craig Ray Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Cade Richard Cole
Represented By: Cade Richard Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Represented By: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?