Daley v. Allstate Indemnity Co
Plaintiff: Robert Daley, Jr. and Robert Daley, Jr
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Co and Allstate Indemnity Co
Special Master: Cade Richard Cole and Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Case Number: 2:2021cv00708
Filed: March 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Derek Clinton Brasher (aty,Brasher, Derek)
April 12, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allstate Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Corp for Allstate Insurance Co. (aty,Jackson, James) Modified on 4/12/2021 to modify docket text (Miletello, A).
April 9, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Allstate Insurance Co incorrectly named as Allstate Indemnity Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Steven Eric Soileau added to party Allstate Indemnity Co(pty:dft))(aty,Soileau, Steven) Modified on 4/9/2021 to modify filer(Miletello, A).
March 22, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Daley, Jr. Allstate Indemnity Co served on 3/19/2021, answer due 4/9/2021. (aty,Muckleroy, Joseph)
March 18, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allstate Indemnity Co. (crt,Miletello, A)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Miletello, A)
March 17, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Miletello, A)
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Allstate Indemnity Co with Jury Demand filed by Robert Daley Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(aty,Muckleroy, Joseph) Modified on 3/17/2021 to modify docket text (Miletello, A).
March 17, 2021 Filing 1 FILED IN ERROR. RESUBMITTED IN ITS ENTIRETY AT DOC #2 . COMPLAINT against Allstate Indemnity Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4610333) filed by Robert Daley, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Joseph Muckleroy added to party Robert Daley, Jr. (pty:pla))(aty,Muckleroy, Joseph) Modified on 3/17/2021 to indicate resubmitted at Doc #2 (Miletello, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daley v. Allstate Indemnity Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Cade Richard Cole
Represented By: Cade Richard Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Represented By: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Daley, Jr.
Represented By: Derek Clinton Brasher
Represented By: Joseph Muckleroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Daley, Jr
Represented By: Derek Clinton Brasher
Represented By: Joseph Muckleroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Co
Represented By: Steven Eric Soileau
Represented By: Gemma Zuniga
Represented By: James Kristopher Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Co
Represented By: Steven Eric Soileau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?