Johnson et al v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co
Plaintiff: Melvin C Johnson and Rhonda G Johnson
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Co
Special Master: Cade Richard Cole and Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Case Number: 2:2021cv00709
Filed: March 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co.(Attorney Jacques Paul Landrieu added to party State Farm Fire & Casualty Co(pty:dft))(aty,Landrieu, Jacques)
March 22, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melvin C Johnson, Rhonda G Johnson. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co served on 3/19/2021, answer due 4/9/2021. (aty,Middleton, Troy)
March 17, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (crt,Bunting, M)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Bunting, M)
March 17, 2021 Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay added. (crt,Bunting, M)
March 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Statutory Penalties against State Farm Fire & Casualty Co (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4610356) filed by Melvin C Johnson, Rhonda G Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Troy Houston Middleton, IV added to party Melvin C Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Troy Houston Middleton, IV added to party Rhonda G Johnson(pty:pla))(aty,Middleton, Troy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Cade Richard Cole
Represented By: Cade Richard Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Represented By: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin C Johnson
Represented By: Matthew E Lundy
Represented By: Daniel A Kramer
Represented By: Hunter W Lundy
Represented By: Troy Houston Middleton, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda G Johnson
Represented By: Matthew E Lundy
Represented By: Daniel A Kramer
Represented By: Hunter W Lundy
Represented By: Troy Houston Middleton, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Co
Represented By: Adam Patrick Massey
Represented By: Jacques Paul Landrieu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?