Johnson v. Allstate Insurance Co
Plaintiff: Eileen Johnson
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company and Allstate Insurance Co
Special Master: Cade Richard Cole and Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Case Number: 2:2021cv00725
Filed: March 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allstate Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Insurance Corp for Allstate Insurance Co. (aty,Soileau, Steven)
April 12, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Allstate Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Steven Eric Soileau added to party Allstate Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Soileau, Steven)
March 25, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eileen Johnson. Allstate Insurance Co served on 3/24/2021, answer due 4/14/2021. (aty,Devall, Claude)
March 19, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allstate Insurance Co. (crt,Thomas, T)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Thomas, T)
March 18, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thomas, T)
March 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allstate Insurance Company (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4612237) filed by Eileen Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Claude Pierson Devall added to party Eileen Johnson(pty:pla))(aty,Devall, Claude)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Allstate Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Johnson
Represented By: Claude Pierson Devall
Represented By: Max Emile Guthrie
Represented By: Donald W McKnight
Represented By: Douglas Cooper Fournet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Co
Represented By: Steven Eric Soileau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Cade Richard Cole
Represented By: Cade Richard Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Represented By: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?