England v. Allstate Indemnity Co
Plaintiff: Daniel England
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Company and Allstate Indemnity Co
Special Master: Cade Richard Cole and Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Case Number: 2:2021cv00726
Filed: March 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allstate Indemnity Co identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Insurance Holdings L L C, Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Allstate Indemnity Co. (aty,Resor, Stephen)
April 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #7 Answer to Complaint, sent to Stephen Charles Resor, Amy Dunn Hotard, Stephannie Marie McKinney, Helen Meredith Buckley on behalf of Allstate Indemnity Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/30/2021. (crt,Jones, P)
April 16, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Allstate Indemnity Co.(Attorney Stephen Charles Resor added to party Allstate Indemnity Co(pty:dft))(aty,Resor, Stephen)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Richard J Fernandez for Daniel England. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 4/13/2021. (crt,Miletello, A)
April 9, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Richard Fernandez to Enroll as Additional Counsel by Daniel England. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Devall, Claude) Modified docket text on 4/12/2021 (Bunting, M).
March 23, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel England. Allstate Indemnity Co served on 3/23/2021, answer due 4/13/2021. (aty,Devall, Claude)
March 19, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allstate Indemnity Co. (crt,Jones, P)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Jones, P)
March 18, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Jones, P)
March 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allstate Indemnity Co (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4612270) filed by Daniel England. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Claude Pierson Devall added to party Daniel England(pty:pla))(aty,Devall, Claude) Modified on 3/19/2021 to edit text (Jones, P).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: England v. Allstate Indemnity Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Co
Represented By: Stephannie Marie McKinney
Represented By: Helen Meredith Buckley
Represented By: Amy Dunn Hotard
Represented By: Stephen Charles Resor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel England
Represented By: Claude Pierson Devall
Represented By: Max Emile Guthrie
Represented By: Donald W McKnight
Represented By: Douglas Cooper Fournet
Represented By: Richard J Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Cade Richard Cole
Represented By: Cade Richard Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Represented By: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?