Alexander et al v. GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co
Plaintiff: Larry W. Alexander, Misty Alexander and Larry W Alexander
Defendant: GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co
Special Master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr and Cade Richard Cole
Case Number: 2:2021cv03166
Filed: August 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Matthew D Klakulak for Larry W Alexander,Matthew D Klakulak for Misty Alexander. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 9/8/2021. (crt,Jones, P)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Robert M Giroux for Larry W Alexander,Robert M Giroux for Misty Alexander. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 9/8/2021. (crt,Jones, P)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #2 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Michael K Cox for Larry W Alexander and Misty Alexander. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 9/2/2021. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
September 2, 2021 Filing 7 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Signature Pages with Wet Signatures filed by Larry W Alexander, Misty Alexander regarding #6 MOTION for Matthew D. Klakulak to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4805031), #5 MOTION for Robert M. Giroux to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4804984) . (aty,Camel, Kevin)
September 1, 2021 Motions Transferred regarding #6 MOTION for Matthew D. Klakulak to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4805031), #5 MOTION for Robert M. Giroux to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4804984). Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Jones, P)
September 1, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Matthew D. Klakulak to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4805031) by Larry W. Alexander, Misty Alexander. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Camel, Kevin) Modified on 9/1/2021 to edit text (Jones, P). Modified on 9/2/2021 to indicate SEE #7 Corrective Document (Jones, P).
September 1, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Robert M. Giroux to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4804984) by Larry W. Alexander, Misty Alexander. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Camel, Kevin) Modified on 9/1/2021 to edit text (Jones, P). Modified on 9/2/2021 to indicate SEE #7 Corrective Document (Jones, P).
September 1, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co. (crt,Bunting, M)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Bunting, M)
August 31, 2021 Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay added. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 31, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Michael K. Cox to Enroll as Counsel by Larry W. Alexander, Misty Alexander. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/31/2021. (aty,Camel, Kevin)
August 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4802505) filed by Larry W. Alexander, Misty Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Attorney Kevin L Camel added to party Larry W. Alexander(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin L Camel added to party Misty Alexander(pty:pla))(aty,Camel, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander et al v. GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry W. Alexander
Represented By: Kevin L Camel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Alexander
Represented By: Kevin L Camel
Represented By: Matthew D Klakulak
Represented By: Michael K Cox
Represented By: Robert M Giroux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry W Alexander
Represented By: Kevin L Camel
Represented By: Matthew D Klakulak
Represented By: Michael K Cox
Represented By: Robert M Giroux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Represented By: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Cade Richard Cole
Represented By: Cade Richard Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?