Behan v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Andrea L Behan
Defendant: U S Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2021cv03321
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Filing 7 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. (crt,Whidden, C)
October 14, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Andrea L Behan. U S Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/30/2021, answer due 12/29/2021. Service made upon: U S Attorney;U S Attorney General;Commissioner of SSA. (aty,Lemoine, Peter)
September 17, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/17/2021. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to US Attorney, US Attorney General and Comm of Social Security. (crt,Crick, S)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/16/2021. (crt,Crick, S)
September 15, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Crick, S)
September 15, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andrea L Behan. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Lemoine, Peter)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U S Commissioner of Social Security (In Forma Pauperis status requested and/or granted) filed by Andrea L Behan. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Peter J Lemoine added to party Andrea L Behan(pty:pla))(aty,Lemoine, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Behan v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea L Behan
Represented By: Peter J Lemoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?