Garza v. Artisan & Truckers Casualty Insurance Co et al
Plaintiff: Mark Garza
Defendant: Artisan and Truckers Casualty Insurance Company, Northline Logistics, LLC, Melvin Viano, Artisan & Truckers Casualty Insurance Co and Northline Logistics L L C
Case Number: 2:2021cv03816
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2022 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Northline Logistics L L C. (aty,MacDonald, Ian)
February 9, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #9 Answer to Complaint, sent to Ian A MacDonald on behalf of Northline Logistics L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/23/2022. (crt,Jones, P)
February 9, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Northline Logistics L L C.(Attorney Ian A MacDonald added to party Northline Logistics L L C(pty:dft))(aty,MacDonald, Ian)
December 7, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Petition for Damages served on Northline Logistics, LLC on 11/12/2021, filed by Mark Garza. (aty,Williamson, Michael)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/2/2021. (crt,LaCombe, L)
November 2, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Artisan & Truckers Casualty Insurance Co (aty,Giordano, Charles)
November 2, 2021 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Artisan & Truckers Casualty Insurance Co. (aty,Giordano, Charles)
November 2, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Artisan & Truckers Casualty Insurance Co.(aty,Giordano, Charles)
November 1, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/1/2021. (crt,Jones, P)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Artisan & Truckers Casualty Insurance Co identifying Other Affiliate Artisan & Truckers Casualty Co, Other Affiliate Progressive Commercial Holdings Inc, Other Affiliate Progressive Corp for Artisan & Truckers Casualty Insurance Co. (aty,Escudier, Michael) Modified on 11/1/2021 to edit text (Jones, P).
October 28, 2021 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Artisan & Truckers Casualty Insurance Co answer due 11/4/2021. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL. (crt,Jones, P)
October 28, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Jones, P)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu, Case Number 2021-3801 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4876186) filed by Artisan and Truckers Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complete State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Verification, #4 Consent to Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Notice of Removal to Adverse Parties, #6 List of Documents Included in the State Court Record, #7 Exhibit A: Complete State Court Record)(Attorney Michael Emile Escudier added to party Artisan and Truckers Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft))(aty,Escudier, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garza v. Artisan & Truckers Casualty Insurance Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Garza
Represented By: Aaron James Broussard
Represented By: Jason Ryan Bell
Represented By: John Mark Fezio
Represented By: Michael J Williamson
Represented By: Rachel K Couvillion
Represented By: Steven Broussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Artisan and Truckers Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Emile Escudier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northline Logistics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin Viano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Artisan & Truckers Casualty Insurance Co
Represented By: Charles V Giordano
Represented By: Michael Emile Escudier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northline Logistics L L C
Represented By: Ian A MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?