Bufkin Enterprises L L C v. Indian Harbor Insurance Co et al
Plaintiff: Bufkin Enterprises, LLC and Bufkin Enterprises L L C
Defendant: Indian Harbor Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, United Specialty Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, United Specialty Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co and Old Republic Union Insurance Co
Special Master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr and Cade Richard Cole
Case Number: 2:2021cv04017
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2022 Filing 16 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Exhibit 6 Corrected filed by Bufkin Enterprises L L C regarding #13 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, . (aty,Watson, Wells)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #14 Motion for Hearing: A hearing on the #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation is set for for 2/15/2022 at 10:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 4 before Judge Cain. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/13/2022. (crt,Higgins, M)
January 12, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Hearing re #13 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by Bufkin Enterprises L L C. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Watson, Wells)
January 12, 2022 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation filed by Bufkin Enterprises L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(aty,Watson, Wells)
December 23, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1" -- Post Removal Pleadings)(aty,Dodd, Virginia)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of briefing deadlines re: #7 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation until 1/12/2022. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/10/2021. (crt,Jones, P)
December 10, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation. Responses due by 1/12/2022 (crt,Jones, P)
December 9, 2021 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Briefing Deadlines with consent by General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co and Bufkin Enterprises L L C. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Dodd, Virginia) Modified filers on 12/9/2021 (Bunting, M).
December 6, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Steadfast Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Zurich American Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., Other Affiliate Zurich Insurance Company Ltd., Other Affiliate Zurich Insurance Group Ltd. for Steadfast Insurance Co; Corporate Parent Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Safety National, Other Affiliate Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc. for Safety Specialty Insurance Co; Corporate Parent Old Republic Union Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Old Republic General Insurance Group, Other Affiliate Old Republic International Corp. for Old Republic Union Insurance Co; Corporate Parent United Specialty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate State National Insurance Company, Inc. for United Specialty Insurance Co; Corporate Parent Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Other Affiliate XL Specialty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate XL Reinsurance of America, Inc., Other Affiliate X.L. America, Inc., Other Affiliate XL Group Ltd., Other Affiliate AXA SA, Other Affiliate AXA XL for Indian Harbor Insurance Co; Corporate Parent QBE Specialty Insurance Co., Other Affiliate QBE Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate QBE Atlantic, LLC, Other Affiliate QBE Investments (North America) Inc., Other Affiliate QBE Insurance Holdings Pty.Ltd., Other Affiliate QBE Insurance Group, Ltd. for Q B E Specialty Insurance Co; Corporate Parent Lexington Insurance Company for Lexington Insurance Co; Corporate Parent General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Other Affiliate SCOR Reinsurance Company, Inc. for General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona. (aty,Dodd, Virginia)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER, Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation: Responses due by 12/13/2021, Replies due by 12/20/2021. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 11/29/2021. (crt,Higgins, M)
November 29, 2021 Motions Transferred regarding #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation. Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. (crt,Bunting, M)
November 26, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation by General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit "A" -- Petition to Compel Arbitration, #3 Exhibit "B" -- Insurance Policy, #4 Exhibit "C" -- 09/23/2021 Plaintiff's Letter, #5 Exhibit "D" -- Original Petition, #6 Exhibit "E" -- Arbitration Demand Letter, #7 Exhibit "F" -- 11/17/2021 Plaintiff's Response Letter, #8 Proposed order)(aty,Duplantis, Heather)
November 24, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Plaintiff's Original Petition for Damages served on Lexington Insurance Company, through its Agent of Process, AIG Property Casualty U.S., General Counsel, filed by Bufkin Enterprises L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,Watson, Wells)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/23/2021. (crt,Taylor, L)
November 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Virginia Y Dodd on behalf of General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/6/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
November 22, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/22/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Bunting, M)
November 19, 2021 Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay added. (crt,Bunting, M)
November 19, 2021 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona answer due 11/26/2021; Indian Harbor Insurance Company answer due 11/26/2021; Lexington Insurance Company answer due 11/26/2021; Old Republic Union Insurance Company answer due 11/26/2021; QBE Specialty Insurance Company answer due 11/26/2021; Safety Specialty Insurance Company answer due 11/26/2021; Steadfast Insurance Company answer due 11/26/2021; United Specialty Insurance Company answer due 11/26/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2021-3722 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4901516) filed by United Specialty Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit "A" -- Certified Insurance Policy, #3 Exhibit "B" -- Original Petition, #4 Exhibit "C" -- State Court Record)(Attorney Virginia Y Dodd added to party General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona(pty:dft), Attorney Virginia Y Dodd added to party Indian Harbor Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Virginia Y Dodd added to party Lexington Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Virginia Y Dodd added to party Old Republic Union Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Virginia Y Dodd added to party QBE Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Virginia Y Dodd added to party Safety Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Virginia Y Dodd added to party Steadfast Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Virginia Y Dodd added to party United Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft))(aty,Dodd, Virginia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bufkin Enterprises L L C v. Indian Harbor Insurance Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bufkin Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bufkin Enterprises L L C
Represented By: Meagan Nicole Johnson
Represented By: Henry John Roth
Represented By: Jeffrey T Gaughan
Represented By: Melissa A Shaw-Brown
Represented By: Wells Talbot Watson
Represented By: Zita Marie Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Represented By: Virginia Y Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Virginia Y Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steadfast Insurance Company
Represented By: Virginia Y Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona
Represented By: Virginia Y Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Virginia Y Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Virginia Y Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safety Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Virginia Y Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Union Insurance Company
Represented By: Virginia Y Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian Harbor Insurance Co
Represented By: Heather Shawn Duplantis
Represented By: Kevin William Welsh
Represented By: Virginia Y Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Q B E Specialty Insurance Co
Represented By: Heather Shawn Duplantis
Represented By: Kevin William Welsh
Represented By: Virginia Y Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steadfast Insurance Co
Represented By: Heather Shawn Duplantis
Represented By: Kevin William Welsh
Represented By: Virginia Y Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona
Represented By: Heather Shawn Duplantis
Represented By: Kevin William Welsh
Represented By: Virginia Y Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Specialty Insurance Co
Represented By: Heather Shawn Duplantis
Represented By: Kevin William Welsh
Represented By: Virginia Y Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Co
Represented By: Heather Shawn Duplantis
Represented By: Kevin William Welsh
Represented By: Virginia Y Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safety Specialty Insurance Co
Represented By: Heather Shawn Duplantis
Represented By: Kevin William Welsh
Represented By: Virginia Y Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Union Insurance Co
Represented By: Heather Shawn Duplantis
Represented By: Kevin William Welsh
Represented By: Virginia Y Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Represented By: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Cade Richard Cole
Represented By: Cade Richard Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?