Flores, Jr et al v. Southern Response Services Inc et al
Plaintiff: David Flores, Jr., Matthew Sirmon and David Flores, Jr
Defendant: Southern Response Services, Inc., BELFOUR USA Group, Inc., Southern Response Services Inc, A B C Insurance Co, Belfor U S A Group Inc and X Y Z Insurance Co
Not Classified By Court: ABC Insurance Company and XYZ Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv04021
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Table of Contents/Table of Authorities re #16 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, Table of Contents/Authorities by David Flores, Jr, Matthew Sirmon. (aty,Khan, Shermin) Modified on 1/11/2022 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Deficiency to Shermin S Khan on behalf of David Flores, Jr, Matthew Sirmon regarding #16 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. Reason: Brief over ten pages requires Table of Contents/Table of Authorities. (crt,Crick, S)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Strike MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Claims/Class Allegations against BELFOR filed by David Flores, Jr, Matthew Sirmon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter to Defendants, #2 Exhibit Certified Mail and Return Receipt)(aty,Khan, Shermin) Modified on 1/11/2022 to indicate deficient status. (Crick, S). Modified on 1/11/2022 to indicate #18 Table of Contents/Table of Authorities submitted. (Crick, S).
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Belfor U S A Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(aty,White, Christine)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against A B C Insurance Co, Belfor U S A Group Inc, Southern Response Services Inc, X Y Z Insurance Co filed by David Flores, Jr, Matthew Sirmon. NO PDF ATTACHED - See #13 Response to Removal Order, attachment #1 (filed 11/9/2021 in 14th JDC, Parish of Calcasieu)(crt,Bunting, M)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Michael H Schwartzberg for David Flores, Jr,Michael H Schwartzberg for Matthew Sirmon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 12/23/2021. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Belfor U S A Group Inc . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record prior to Removal)(aty,Juneau, Matthew)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #10 MOTION to Strike MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Claims/Class Allegations against BELFOR. Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. Motion day set for 1/26/2022 before Judge James D Cain Jr. (crt,Crick, S)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #8 MOTION to Remand . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Crick, S)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Strike (Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/17/2021.), MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Claims/Class Allegations against BELFOR by Belfor U S A Group Inc. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,White, Christine)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Michael H. Schwartzberg to Enroll as Counsel by David Flores, Jr, Matthew Sirmon. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Roach, Barry)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by David Flores, Jr, Matthew Sirmon. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Proposed order)(aty,Roach, Barry) Modified on 12/20/2021 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer plaintiffs' petition, Belfor U S A Group Inc answer due 12/17/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/29/2021. (crt,Benoit, T)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Belfor USA Group Inc identifying Corporate Parent Belfor USA Ltd for Belfor USA Group Inc. (aty,White, Christine) Modified docket text on 11/29/2021 (Miletello, A).
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by Belfor USA Group Inc. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Juneau, Matthew) Modified on 11/24/2021 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/23/2021. (crt,Taylor, L)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Christine M White on behalf of Belfor USA Group Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/6/2021. (crt,Crick, S)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/22/2021. (crt,Crick, S)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Crick, S)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. BELFOR U S A Group Inc answer due 11/26/2021. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #1 to #1 Notice of Removal. (crt,Crick, S)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2021-004092 (Filing fee $402, receipt number BLAWDC-4901679) filed by BELFOR U S A Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-state court pleadings, #2 Exhibit 2-citation, #3 Exhibit 3-state court notice, #4 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Christine M White added to party BELFOR U S A Group Inc(pty:dft))(aty,White, Christine) Modified on 11/22/2021 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores, Jr et al v. Southern Response Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: XYZ Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Flores, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Sirmon
Represented By: Shermin S Khan
Represented By: Barry A Roach
Represented By: Michael H Schwartzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Flores, Jr
Represented By: Shermin S Khan
Represented By: Barry A Roach
Represented By: Michael H Schwartzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Response Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BELFOUR USA Group, Inc.
Represented By: Christine M White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Response Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A B C Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belfor U S A Group Inc
Represented By: Christine M White
Represented By: Matthew Charles Juneau
Represented By: Steven Franklin Griffith, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X Y Z Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?