Steward v. West et al
Plaintiff: Christina Steward
Defendant: John West, Lyle Machinery Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company, Lyle Machinery Co and National Union Fire Insurance Co
Case Number: 2:2021cv04056
Filed: November 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/12/2022 at 03:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Attachment: #1 Attachment to scheduling conference order)(crt,Benoit, T)
December 21, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Lyle Machinery Co, National Union Fire Insurance Co, John West List of Parties and Submission of Documents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,Eagan, Emily)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #11 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Rodger Gregory Green, Jr for Christina Steward. Attorneys Misti Landry Bryant and Tucker Wagner Nims terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 12/15/2021. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
December 14, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Rodger "Rory" G. Green, Jr. in place of Misti Bryant & Tucker Nims with consent by Christina Steward. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/14/2021. (aty,Green, Rodger)
December 9, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Deficiency to Misti Landry Bryant, Tucker Wagner Nims, Rodger Gregory Green, Jr on behalf of Christina Steward regarding #9 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Rodger "Rory" G. Green, Jr. in place of Misti Bryant & Tucker Nims with consent sought but not yet obtained. Reason: Either no proposed order accompanied this motion or the proposed order was not on a separate page. Please see LR7.4.1 or LR58.1 for additional information. The motion cannot be referred to chambers until this deficiency is corrected. (crt,Jones, P)
December 8, 2021 Filing 9 DEFICIENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney Rodger "Rory" G. Green, Jr. in place of Misti Bryant & Tucker Nims with consent sought but not yet obtained by Christina Steward. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/8/2021. (Attorney Rodger Gregory Green, Jr added to party Christina Steward(pty:pla))(aty,Green, Rodger) (Main Document 9 replaced on 12/9/2021) (Jones, P). Modified on 12/9/2021 to replace document in proper pdf format and indicate deficiency (Jones, P). Modified to reflect as deficient and resubmitted as #11 Motion on 12/14/2021 (Reeves, T).
December 3, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lyle Machinery Co. (aty,Eagan, Emily)
December 3, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by National Union Fire Insurance Co identifying Other Affiliate American International Group Inc, Other Affiliate A I G Property Casualty U S Inc, Other Affiliate A I G Property Casualty Inc for National Union Fire Insurance Co. (aty,Eagan, Emily)
December 3, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Lyle Machinery Co, National Union Fire Insurance Co, John West.(aty,Eagan, Emily) Modified on 12/5/2021 to edit text (Jones, P).
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/30/2021. (crt,Benoit, T)
November 29, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/29/2021. (crt,Jones, P)
November 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to AsheLee Shante Singleton, Emily E Eagan on behalf of Lyle Machinery Co, National Union Fire Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/13/2021. (crt,Jones, P)
November 29, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Lyle Machinery Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company, John West. (aty,Eagan, Emily)
November 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2021-3933 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4906239) filed by John West, National Union Fire Insurance Co, Lyle Machinery Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Attorney Emily E Eagan added to party Lyle Machinery Co, National Union Fire Insurance Co, John West(pty:dft))(aty,Eagan, Emily) Modified on 11/24/2021 to edit text (Jones, P).
November 24, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Jones, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steward v. West et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Steward
Represented By: Misti Landry Bryant
Represented By: Tucker Wagner Nims
Represented By: Rodger Gregory Green, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John West
Represented By: Emily E Eagan
Represented By: AsheLee Shante Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyle Machinery Company
Represented By: Emily E Eagan
Represented By: AsheLee Shante Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Emily E Eagan
Represented By: AsheLee Shante Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyle Machinery Co
Represented By: Emily E Eagan
Represented By: AsheLee Shante Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Co
Represented By: Emily E Eagan
Represented By: AsheLee Shante Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?