Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Londoin Subscribing to Policy No AMR-63188-02 et al v. Bufkin Enterprises L L C
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, Londoin Subscribing to Policy No. AMR-63188-02, Lexington Insurance Company, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, HDI Global Specialty SE, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No AMR-63188-02, Lexington Insurance Co, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, H D I Global Specialty S E, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co and Safety Specialty Insurance Co
Defendant: Bufkin Enterprises, LLC and Bufkin Enterprises L L C
Special Master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr and Cade Richard Cole
Case Number: 2:2021cv04069
Filed: November 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bufkin Enterprises L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Dismissal, #2 Exhibit 2eg - Removal Notice, #3 Exhibit 2eg - Removal Order, #4 Exhibit 3 - Oppo to Mot to Consolidate)(aty,Watson, Wells)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Bufkin Enterprises L L C answer due 1/20/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 12/28/2021. (crt,Jones, P)
December 28, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Old Republic Union Insurance Co, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No AMR-63188-02, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, H D I Global Specialty S E. Bufkin Enterprises L L C served on 12/9/2021, answer due 12/30/2021. (aty,Duplantis, Heather)
December 21, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bufkin Enterprises L L C. (aty,Watson, Wells)
December 20, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, sent to Wells Talbot Watson on behalf of Bufkin Enterprises L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/3/2022. (crt,Bunting, M)
December 20, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent by Bufkin Enterprises L L C. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order Proposed Order)(Attorney Wells Talbot Watson added to party Bufkin Enterprises L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Watson, Wells) Modified docket text on 12/20/2021 (Bunting, M).
December 20, 2021 Motions Transferred regarding #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint with consent. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Bunting, M)
December 8, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Londoin Subscribing to Policy No AMR-63188-02, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, H D I Global Specialty S E, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate QBE Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate QBE Atlantic, LLC, Other Affiliate QBE Investments (North America), Inc., Other Affiliate QBE Insurance Holdings Pty Ltd., Other Affiliate QBE Insurance Group, Ltd. for Q B E Specialty Insurance Co; Corporate Parent Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Other Affiliate XL Specialty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate XL Reinsurance of America, Inc., Other Affiliate X.L. America, Inc., Other Affiliate XL Group Ltd., Other Affiliate AXA SA, Other Affiliate AXA XL for Indian Harbor Insurance Co; Corporate Parent Steadfast Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Zurich American Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., Other Affiliate Zurich Insurance Company, Ltd., Other Affiliate Zurich Insurance Group, Ltd. for Steadfast Insurance Co; Corporate Parent General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Other Affiliate SCOR Reinsurance Company, Inc. for General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona; Corporate Parent Lexington Insurance Company for Lexington Insurance Co; Corporate Parent United Specialty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate State National Insurance Company, Inc. for United Specialty Insurance Co; Corporate Parent Old Republic Union Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Old Republic General Insurance Group, Other Affiliate Old Republic International Corp. for Old Republic Union Insurance Co; Corporate Parent Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Safety National, Other Affiliate Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc. for Safety Specialty Insurance Co; Corporate Parent Syndicate 1861, Corporate Parent Syndicate 2121, Corporate Parent Syndicate 2987, Corporate Parent Syndicate 510, Corporate Parent Syndicate 33, Corporate Parent Syndicate 1301, Corporate Parent Syndicate 2988, Corporate Parent Syndicate 609, Corporate Parent Syndicate 1969, Corporate Parent Syndicate 2623, Corporate Parent Syndicate 3268, Corporate Parent Syndicate 727, Corporate Parent Syndicate 623, Corporate Parent Syndicate 2003, Corporate Parent Syndicate 4444, Corporate Parent Syndicate 1886, Corporate Parent Syndicate 5886, Corporate Parent Syndicate 1183, Corporate Parent Syndicate 2010, Corporate Parent Syndicate 1686, Corporate Parent Syndicate 1856, Corporate Parent Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. AMR-63188-02, Other Affiliate Hannover Re, Other Affiliate PartnerRe Ltd., Other Affiliate Tokio Marine Kiln Syndicates Limited, Other Affiliate Tokio Marine Kiln Group Limited, Other Affiliate Tokio Marine & Nichido Fire Insurance Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Tokio Marine Underwriting Limited, Other Affiliate QBE Underwriting Limited, Other Affiliate QBE European Operations, Other Affiliate QBE Insurance Group, Other Affiliate Brit Syndicates Limited, Other Affiliate Brit UW Limited, Other Affiliate Hiscox Syndicates Limited, Other Affiliate Hiscox Ltd., Other Affiliate StarStone Underwriting Limited, Other Affiliate StarStone Insurance Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate IQUW Syndicate Management Limited, Other Affiliate AXIS Managing Agency Ltd., Other Affiliate Asta Managing Agency Ltd., Other Affiliate Asta Capital Ltd., Other Affiliate Asta Capital Limited, Other Affiliate Talbot Underwriting Ltd., Other Affiliate Talbot Underwritings Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate American International Group Inc., Other Affiliate Argenta Syndicate Management Limited, Other Affiliate Argenta Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Hannover Ruck SE, Other Affiliate Talanx AG, Other Affiliate Haftpflichtverbnad der Deutschen Industrie V.a.G., Other Affiliate Cathedral Underwriting Ltd., Other Affiliate Cathedral Capital Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Lancashire Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Beazley Furlonge Limited, Other Affiliate Beazley Furlonge Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Catlin Underwriters Agencies Limited, Other Affiliate Catlin Syndicate Limited, Other Affiliate Apollo Syndicate Management Limited, Other Affiliate Apollo Partners, LLP, Other Affiliate DCB Ibeson, Other Affiliate Metacomet LLC, Other Affiliate SAC White, Other Affiliate Brit Insurance Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Brit Limited, Other Affiliate Fairfax Financial Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Atruim Underwriters Limited, Other Affiliate Atrium Group Limited, Other Affiliate Enstar Group Limited, Other Affiliate Inter Hannover (No. 1) Ltd., Other Affiliate PartnerRe Corporate Ltd., Other Affiliate Exor Nederland N.V., Other Affiliate SCOR Underwriting Limited, Other Affiliate SCOR SE, Other Affiliate Beazley PLC, Other Affiliate S.A. Meacock & Company Limited, Other Affiliate Canopius Managing Agents, Ltd., Other Affiliate Canopius Holdings UK, Ltd., Other Affiliate Sompo Japan Nipponkoa Insurance Inc., Other Affiliate Sompo Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate AmTrust Financial Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Canopius Group Limited for Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Londoin Subscribing to Policy No AMR-63188-02; Corporate Parent HDI Global Specialty SE, Other Affiliate Hannover Ruck SE for H D I Global Specialty S E. (aty,Dodd, Virginia)
November 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint, sent to Heather Shawn Duplantis on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Londoin Subscribing to Policy No AMR-63188-02, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, H D I Global Specialty S E, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/13/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
November 29, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bufkin Enterprises L L C. (crt,Bunting, M)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Bunting, M)
November 26, 2021 Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay added. (crt,Bunting, M)
November 26, 2021 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued as to Bufkin Enterprises, LLC, submitted by Old Republic Union Insurance Company, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, Londoin Subscribing to Policy No. AMR-63188-02, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, HDI Global Specialty SE. (aty,Duplantis, Heather)
November 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT "Petition to Compel Arbitrationand Stay Litigation with Incorporated Supporting Memorandum of Law against Bufkin Enterprises, LLC (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4907477) filed by Old Republic Union Insurance Company, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, Londoin Subscribing to Policy No. AMR-63188-02, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, HDI Global Specialty SE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" -- Insurance Policy, #2 Exhibit "B" -- 9/23/21 Letter from Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit "C" -- Petition, #4 Exhibit "D" -- Arbitration Demand Letter, #5 Exhibit "E" -- 11/17/21 Plaintiff's Response Letter, #6 Exhibit "F" -- Glad Tidings Memorandum Order, #7 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Heather Shawn Duplantis added to party Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, Londoin Subscribing to Policy No. AMR-63188-02(pty:pla), Attorney Heather Shawn Duplantis added to party General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona(pty:pla), Attorney Heather Shawn Duplantis added to party HDI Global Specialty SE(pty:pla), Attorney Heather Shawn Duplantis added to party Indian Harbor Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Heather Shawn Duplantis added to party Lexington Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Heather Shawn Duplantis added to party Old Republic Union Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Heather Shawn Duplantis added to party QBE Specialty Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Heather Shawn Duplantis added to party Safety Specialty Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Heather Shawn Duplantis added to party Steadfast Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Heather Shawn Duplantis added to party United Specialty Insurance Company(pty:pla))(aty,Duplantis, Heather)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Londoin Subscribing to Policy No AMR-63188-02 et al v. Bufkin Enterprises L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, Londoin Subscribing to Policy No. AMR-63188-02
Represented By: Heather Shawn Duplantis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Heather Shawn Duplantis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona
Represented By: Heather Shawn Duplantis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Represented By: Heather Shawn Duplantis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HDI Global Specialty SE
Represented By: Heather Shawn Duplantis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Old Republic Union Insurance Company
Represented By: Heather Shawn Duplantis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QBE Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Heather Shawn Duplantis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steadfast Insurance Company
Represented By: Heather Shawn Duplantis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Heather Shawn Duplantis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safety Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Heather Shawn Duplantis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No AMR-63188-02
Represented By: Heather Shawn Duplantis
Represented By: Virginia Y Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lexington Insurance Co
Represented By: Heather Shawn Duplantis
Represented By: Virginia Y Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona
Represented By: Heather Shawn Duplantis
Represented By: Virginia Y Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indian Harbor Insurance Co
Represented By: Heather Shawn Duplantis
Represented By: Virginia Y Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H D I Global Specialty S E
Represented By: Heather Shawn Duplantis
Represented By: Virginia Y Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Old Republic Union Insurance Co
Represented By: Heather Shawn Duplantis
Represented By: Virginia Y Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Q B E Specialty Insurance Co
Represented By: Heather Shawn Duplantis
Represented By: Virginia Y Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steadfast Insurance Co
Represented By: Heather Shawn Duplantis
Represented By: Virginia Y Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Specialty Insurance Co
Represented By: Heather Shawn Duplantis
Represented By: Virginia Y Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safety Specialty Insurance Co
Represented By: Heather Shawn Duplantis
Represented By: Virginia Y Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bufkin Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bufkin Enterprises L L C
Represented By: Wells Talbot Watson
Represented By: Kevin Ross Sloan
Represented By: Meagan Nicole Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Represented By: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Cade Richard Cole
Represented By: Cade Richard Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?