Vintage Realty Co L L C et al v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London severally subscribing to Certificate No AMR-59283-03
Plaintiff: Vintage Realty Co, Nelson Pointe Apartment Homes, LLC, Vintage Realty Co L L C and Nelson Pointe Apartment Homes L L C
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Co, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, United Specialty Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, HDI Global Specialty SE, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Severally Subscribing to Certificate No AMR-59283-03, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co and H D I Global Specialty S E
Special Master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr and Cade Richard Cole
Case Number: 2:2021cv04301
Filed: December 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. Considering the foregoing Motion to Stay and Motion to Continue [doc. 13], the court orders that the motions be GRANTED and that this matter be stayed and that all briefing deadlines relating to the pending Motion to Compel Arbitration [doc. 7] be continued while the parties attempt mediation of their dispute. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/21/2022. (crt,Crick, S)
January 19, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #13 MOTION to Stay re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings MOTION to Stay MOTION to Continue., Set/Reset Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Stay re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings MOTION to Stay MOTION to Continue.(Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/19/2022.) Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. (crt,Crick, S)
January 19, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings, MOTION to Continue Hearings & Deadlines by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Severally Subscribing to Certificate No AMR-59283-03, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, H D I Global Specialty S E, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Rew, Phillip). Added MOTION to Continue on 1/20/2022 (Crick, S).
December 29, 2021 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Severally Subscribing to Certificate No AMR-59283-03, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, H D I Global Specialty S E, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Old Republic International Corp for Old Republic Union Insurance Co; Corporate Parents, Q B E Atlantic L L C, Q B E Investments (North America) Inc, Q B E Insurance Holdings Pty Ltd, Other Affiliate Q B E Holdings Inc for Q B E Specialty Insurance Co; Corporate Parents, Hannover Re, H D I Global S E, Talanx Group for H D I Global Specialty S E; Corporate Parents X L Bermuda Ltd (Bermuda), X L I T Ltd (Cayman), X L Group Ltd (Bermuda), Exel Holding Ltd (Cayman), X L Specialty Insurance Co, Other Affiliates X L Reinsurance America Inc (New York), X L America Inc (Delaware) for Indian Harbor Insurance Co; Corporate Parent S C O R Reinsurance Co Inc for General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona; Corporate Parent State National Insurance Co Inc for United Specialty Insurance Co; Corporate Parents, American International Group Inc, Fairfax Financial Holdings Ltd, Axis Capital Holdings Ltd, Tokio Marine Holdings Inc, Enstar Group Ltd, Hannover Re, Hiscox Ltd, Talanx A G, Sompo Holdings Inc, Kenmare Holdings Ltd, Brit Insurance Holdings Ltd, Tokio Marine Kiln Group Ltd, Argenta Holdings Ltd, Hannover Ruck S E, Haftpflichtverband der Deutschen Industrie V a G, Asta Capital Ltd, Beazley Furlonge Holdings Ltd, Exor Nederland N V, Beasley p l c, Q B E Insurance, Lancashire Holdings Ltd, Shelbourne Group Ltd, Cathedral Capital Holdings Ltd, Tokio Marine & Nichido Insurance Co Ltd, Other Affiliates, Talbot Underwriting Ltd, Brit Syndicates Ltd, Beazley Furlonge Ltd, Q B E Underwriting Ltd, Brit U W Ltd, Vanguard Group, Argenta Syndicate Management Ltd, Tokio Marine Kiln Syndicates Ltd, Asta Managing Agency Ltd, S G L No 1 Ltd, T Rowe Price, Apollo Syndicate Management Ltd, Apollo Partners L L P, D C B Ibeson, S A C White, Hiscox Syndicates Ltd, Catlin Syndicate Ltd, Inter Hannover (No 1) Ltd, PartnerRe Corporate Ltd, PartnerRe Ltd, S C O R Underwriting Ltd, S A Meacock & Co Ltd, Lancashire Syndicates Ltd, Atrium Underwriting Group Ltd, Catlin Underwriters Agencies Ltd, Canopius Managing Agents Ltd, Axis Corporate Capital U K Ltd, Axis Corporate Capital U K II Ltd, Syndicate 510, Syndicate 33, Syndicate 2121, Syndicate 1969, Metacomet L L C, Syndicate 2623, Syndicate 727, Syndicate 623, Syndicate 2987, Syndicate 2003, A X A X L, Syndicate 4444, Syndicate 1861, Syndicate 1886, Syndicate 5886, Syndicate 1183, Syndicate 1301, Syndicate 2010, Cathedral Capital Ltd, Syndicate 609, Syndicate 2988, Brit Ltd, Syndicate 3268, S C O R S E, Syndicate 1856, Syndicate 1225, A E G I S for Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Severally Subscribing to Certificate No AMR-59283-03; Corporate Parents, Safety National Casualty Corp, Tokyo Marine Holdings Inc for Safety Specialty Insurance Co; Corporate Parents, Zurich Insurance Co Ltd, Zurich Insurance Group Ltd, Other Affiliates, Zurich American Insurance Co, Zurich Holding Co of America Inc for Steadfast Insurance Co; Corporate Parents, American International Group Inc, A I G Property Casualty U S Inc, A I G Property Casualty Inc for Lexington Insurance Co. (aty,Rew, Phillip) Modified on 1/5/2022 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, Counterclaim, by Vintage Realty Company, LLC and Nelson Pointe Apartment Homes, LLC. The deadline for Plaintiffs to file their responsive pleading to Defendants Counterclaim [Rec. Doc. 2] and their opposition to Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings [Rec. Doc. 7], be and is hereby extended, up to and including February 3, 2022. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/22/2021. (crt,Benoit, T)
December 21, 2021 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Counterclaim, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings MOTION to Stay. (Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/21/2021.) by Nelson Pointe Apartment Homes L L C, Vintage Realty Co L L C. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Jones, Reid) Modified on 12/21/2021 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER, Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings MOTION to Stay: Responses due by 1/3/2022, Replies due by 1/10/2022. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/20/2021. (crt,Higgins, M)
December 17, 2021 Filing 8 EXHIBIT re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings Table of Contents and Table of Authorities by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Severally Subscribing to Certificate No AMR-59283-03, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, H D I Global Specialty S E, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Rew, Phillip)
December 16, 2021 Motions Transferred regarding #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings MOTION to Stay. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings MOTION to Stay.(Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/16/2021.) Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. (crt,Crick, S)
December 16, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Severally Subscribing to Certificate No AMR-59283-03, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, H D I Global Specialty S E, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit 1-Case law, #3 Proposed order)(aty,Rew, Phillip). Added MOTION to Stay and indicated #8 Table of Contents submitted as separate document on 12/17/2021 (Crick, S).
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 12/16/2021. (crt,Jones, P)
December 15, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/15/2021. (crt,Crick, S)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Phillip J Rew on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, H D I Global Specialty S E, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/29/2021. (crt,Crick, S)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Crick, S)
December 15, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint and First Supplemental and Amended Petition, COUNTERCLAIM against Nelson Pointe Apartment Homes L L C, Vintage Realty Co L L C by Steadfast Insurance Co, H D I Global Specialty S E, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co.(Attorney Phillip J Rew added to party Lexington Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Rew, Phillip) Modified on 12/16/2021to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
December 14, 2021 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, H D I Global Specialty S E, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co filed by Nelson Pointe Apartment Homes L L C, Vintage Realty Co. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found in Attachmen5 #2 to #1 Notice of Removal.(crt,Crick, S)
December 14, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Crick, S)
December 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2021-3795 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4928724) filed by H D I Global Specialty S E, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London severally subscribing to Certificate No AMR-59283-03. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B - Arbitration Clause, #4 Exhibit C - Policy, #5 Exhibit Consents)(Attorney Phillip J Rew added to party Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London severally subscribing to Certificate No AMR-59283-03(pty:dft), H D I Global Specialty S E(pty:dft))(aty,Rew, Phillip) Modified on to modify docket text. 12/15/2021 (Crick, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vintage Realty Co L L C et al v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London severally subscribing to Certificate No AMR-59283-03
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vintage Realty Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Pointe Apartment Homes, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vintage Realty Co L L C
Represented By: Layne A Clark, Jr
Represented By: Reid Allen Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Pointe Apartment Homes L L C
Represented By: Layne A Clark, Jr
Represented By: Reid Allen Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London
Represented By: Phillip J Rew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian Harbor Insurance Co
Represented By: D Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Bruce R Hoefer, Jr
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Melanie Helaine Melasky
Represented By: Phillip J Rew
Represented By: Richard R Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steadfast Insurance Co
Represented By: D Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Bruce R Hoefer, Jr
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Melanie Helaine Melasky
Represented By: Phillip J Rew
Represented By: Richard R Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: D Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Bruce R Hoefer, Jr
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Melanie Helaine Melasky
Represented By: Phillip J Rew
Represented By: Richard R Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Specialty Insurance Co
Represented By: D Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Bruce R Hoefer, Jr
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Phillip J Rew
Represented By: Richard R Stedman, II
Represented By: Melanie Helaine Melasky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Co
Represented By: Phillip J Rew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safety Specialty Insurance Co
Represented By: D Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Bruce R Hoefer, Jr
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Melanie Helaine Melasky
Represented By: Phillip J Rew
Represented By: Richard R Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HDI Global Specialty SE
Represented By: Phillip J Rew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Union Insurance Co
Represented By: D Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Bruce R Hoefer, Jr
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Melanie Helaine Melasky
Represented By: Phillip J Rew
Represented By: Richard R Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Severally Subscribing to Certificate No AMR-59283-03
Represented By: D Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Bruce R Hoefer, Jr
Represented By: Melanie Helaine Melasky
Represented By: Phillip J Rew
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Richard R Stedman, II
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Q B E Specialty Insurance Co
Represented By: Bruce R Hoefer, Jr
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Melanie Helaine Melasky
Represented By: Phillip J Rew
Represented By: Richard R Stedman, II
Represented By: D Russell Holwadel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H D I Global Specialty S E
Represented By: D Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Bruce R Hoefer, Jr
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Melanie Helaine Melasky
Represented By: Phillip J Rew
Represented By: Richard R Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Represented By: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Cade Richard Cole
Represented By: Cade Richard Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?