Hickmon v. Braxton et al
Plaintiff: J'Santae Hickmon and J'Santae E Hickmon
Defendant: Keyshawn L. Braxton, Victoria E. Daulton, Kold Trans, LLC, ACE American Insurance Company, Knight Transportation, Inc., Keyshawn L Braxton, Victoria E Daulton, Kold Trans L L C, Ace American Insurance Co and Knight Transportation Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv04451
Filed: December 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Kold Trans L L C.(aty,Hotard, Amy)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #12 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Gary Lee Blanchard for J'Santae E Hickmon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 1/18/2022. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
January 17, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Gary L. Blanchard to Enroll as Counsel by J'Santae E Hickmon. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Lundy, Matthew)
January 11, 2022 Filing 11 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ace American Insurance Co, Victoria E Daulton, Knight Transportation Inc, Kold Trans L L C. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F)(crt,Jones, P)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to File Amending and Supplemental Notice of Removal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 1/11/2022. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
January 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 1/8/2022. (crt,Benoit, T)
January 6, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ace American Insurance Co, Victoria E Daulton, Knight Transportation Inc.(aty,Hotard, Amy)
January 6, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal,, with consent sought but not yet obtained by Ace American Insurance Co, Victoria E Daulton, Knight Transportation Inc, Kold Trans L L C. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed order, #4 Proposed pleading, #5 Proposed exhibit, #6 Proposed exhibit)(aty,Hotard, Amy)
January 3, 2022 Filing 6 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/3/2022. (crt,Crick, S)
January 3, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. Section 1447(b) by Victoria E Daulton (Attorney Amy Dunn Hotard added to party Victoria E Daulton(pty:dft)) (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings & Defendants' Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(aty,Hotard, Amy)
December 30, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Crick, S)
December 30, 2021 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Ace American Insurance Co answer due 1/6/2022; Knight Transportation Inc answer due 1/6/2022. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF images can be found in Attachments #2 & 4 to #1 Notice of Removal. (crt,Crick, S)
December 30, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ACE American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent INA Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent INA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent INA Corporation, Corporate Parent ACE INA Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent ACE Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent ACE Limited for ACE American Insurance Company (Attorney Amy Dunn Hotard added to party ACE American Insurance Company(pty:dft)). (aty,Hotard, Amy)
December 30, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Knight Transportation, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc. for Knight Transportation, Inc.. (aty,Hotard, Amy)
December 30, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kold Trans, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Knight Transportation, Inc., Other Affiliate Knight Capital Growth, LLC for Kold Trans, LLC (Attorney Amy Dunn Hotard added to party Kold Trans, LLC(pty:dft)). (aty,Hotard, Amy)
December 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2021-4232 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4943916) filed by Knight Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition for Damages, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit C - Keyshawn Braxton Petition, #4 Exhibit D - Certified Mailing, #5 Exhibit E - Consent, #6 Verification, #7 Affidavit of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court, #8 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Amy Dunn Hotard added to party Knight Transportation, Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,Hotard, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hickmon v. Braxton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J'Santae Hickmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J'Santae E Hickmon
Represented By: Matthew E Lundy
Represented By: Gary Lee Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keyshawn L. Braxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria E. Daulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kold Trans, LLC
Represented By: Amy Dunn Hotard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Company
Represented By: Amy Dunn Hotard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Dunn Hotard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keyshawn L Braxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria E Daulton
Represented By: Amy Dunn Hotard
Represented By: Carlina Castro Eiselen
Represented By: David P Salley
Represented By: Stephannie M England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kold Trans L L C
Represented By: Amy Dunn Hotard
Represented By: Carlina Castro Eiselen
Represented By: David P Salley
Represented By: Stephannie M England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Co
Represented By: Amy Dunn Hotard
Represented By: Carlina Castro Eiselen
Represented By: David P Salley
Represented By: Stephannie M England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight Transportation Inc
Represented By: Amy Dunn Hotard
Represented By: Carlina Castro Eiselen
Represented By: David P Salley
Represented By: Stephannie M England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?