A D B Commercial Construction (Louisiana) L L C v. St Charles Housing L P
Plaintiff: A D B Commercial Construction (Louisiana) L L C
Defendant: St Charles Housing L P
Case Number: 2:2022cv01083
Filed: April 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by A D B Commercial Construction (Louisiana) L L C. St Charles Housing L P waiver sent on 5/9/2022, answer due 7/8/2022. (aty,Olinde, Yvonne)
May 4, 2022 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by A D B Commercial Construction (Louisiana) L L C identifying Corporate Parent ADB Commercial Construction (Gulf Coast), LLC, Corporate Parent ADB Commercial Construction, Inc. for A D B Commercial Construction (Louisiana) L L C. (aty,Graves, Edwin)
April 25, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint, sent to Edwin Allen Graves, Jr on behalf of A D B Commercial Construction (Louisiana) L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/9/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
April 25, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to St Charles Housing L P. (crt,Thomas, T)
April 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against St Charles Housing L P (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5080656) filed by A D B Commercial Construction (Louisiana) L LC . (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Edwin Allen Graves, Jr added to party ADB Commercial Construction (Louisiana), LLC(pty:pla))(aty,Graves, Edwin) Modified on 4/25/2022 (Thomas, T).
April 25, 2022 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thomas, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A D B Commercial Construction (Louisiana) L L C v. St Charles Housing L P
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A D B Commercial Construction (Louisiana) L L C
Represented By: Edwin Allen Graves, Jr
Represented By: David W Carley
Represented By: Joshua Joseph Coleman
Represented By: Russell J Stutes, Jr
Represented By: Russell Joseph Stutes
Represented By: Yvonne Reed Olinde
Represented By: Russell Joseph Stutes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Charles Housing L P
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?