Antoine v. Unknown Defendant
Plaintiff: Toby Antoine and Toby Lee Antoine
Defendant: LA 3rd Circuit Court of Appeals and Unknown Defendant
Case Number: 2:2022cv01092
Filed: April 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2022 Filing 4 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Signature page of petition filed by Toby Lee Antoine regarding #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
May 23, 2022 FILING FEE RECEIVED: on behalf of Toby Lee Antoine in the amount of $5.00, receipt number 54635067270. (crt,Chavis, J)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. ( Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 6/1/2022). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 5/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 signature page of petition, #2 IFP form)(crt,Haik, K)
April 29, 2022 Filing 2 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/29/2022. (crt,Devillier, W)
April 25, 2022 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Devillier, W)
April 25, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Toby Lee Antoine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope, #3 Civil cover sheet)(crt,Jones, P) Modified to edit text on 4/29/2022 (Devillier, W). (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/29/2022) (Devillier, W).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antoine v. Unknown Defendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toby Antoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toby Lee Antoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA 3rd Circuit Court of Appeals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Defendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?