Southwest Marketing & Distribution L L C v. Scottsdale Insurance Co
Plaintiff: Southwest Marketing & Distribution L L C
Defendant: Scottsdale Insurance Co
Special Master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr and Cade Richard Cole
Case Number: 2:2022cv05906
Filed: November 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Compliance by Scottsdale Insurance Co (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,Menou, Sydnee)
November 30, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Scottsdale Insurance Co.(aty,Wolff, John)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer with consent #1 Notice of Removal. Scottsdale Insurance Co answer due 11/30/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/9/2022. (crt,Roaix, G)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/9/2022. (crt,Roaix, G)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Motion to Expedite Consideration of Motion for Extension. The extension is granted by separate, written order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/9/2022. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
November 8, 2022 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Scottsdale Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Scottsdale Insurance Co. (aty,Wolff, John)
November 8, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Expedite consideration of #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, with consent by Scottsdale Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Wolff, John)
November 8, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, with consent by Scottsdale Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Wolff, John)
November 8, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #6 MOTION to Expedite consideration of #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, with consent , #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, with consent . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Chavis, J)
November 7, 2022 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/7/2022. (crt,Chavis, J)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO 1. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 9/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Additional Neutrals)(crt,Chavis, J)
November 7, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to John Powers Wolff, III on behalf of Scottsdale Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/21/2022. (crt,Chavis, J)
November 7, 2022 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Scottsdale Insurance Co answer due 11/14/2022. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found in Attachment #4 to Document #1 , Notice of Removal. (crt,Chavis, J)
November 7, 2022 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Chavis, J)
November 7, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5357726) filed by Scottsdale Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Notice to Adverse Party, #3 Notice of Compliance, #4 Exhibit Petition for Damages, #5 Exhibit Estimate)(Attorney John Powers Wolff, III added to party Scottsdale Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Wolff, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southwest Marketing & Distribution L L C v. Scottsdale Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Represented By: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Cade Richard Cole
Represented By: Cade Richard Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southwest Marketing & Distribution L L C
Represented By: Michael G Hodgkins
Represented By: Katherine Belle Remy
Represented By: Michael D Lonegrass
Represented By: Richard P Voorhies, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottsdale Insurance Co
Represented By: John Powers Wolff, III
Represented By: Cole Cisco Frazier
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Sydnee Doolittle Menou
Represented By: Courtney Lehan Fournet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?