Alston v. United National Insurance Co
Plaintiff: Randy Alston
Defendant: United National Insurance Co
Special Master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr and Cade Richard Cole
Case Number: 2:2022cv05947
Filed: November 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2022 Filing 15 JUDGMENT granting #9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/28/2022. (crt,Breite, S)
December 15, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by United National Insurance Co . (aty,Andrews, Erica)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC ORDER re #12 MOTION to Opt Out of Streamlined Settlement Process filed by United National Insurance Co: Responses due by 12/27/2022, Replies due by 1/3/2023. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/14/2022. (crt,Higgins, M)
December 13, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Opt Out of Streamlined Settlement Process by United National Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief Memo in Support of Motion to Opt Out, #2 Proposed order Proposed Order to Motion to Opt Out)(aty,Andrews, Erica)
December 2, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. Motion day set for 12/28/2022 before Judge James D Cain Jr. (crt,Bunting, M)
November 30, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by United National Insurance Co.(aty,Andrews, Erica)
November 30, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by United National Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A-Policy of Insurance, #3 Exhibit B-Affidavit, #4 Exhibit C-Correspondence)(aty,Andrews, Erica)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, with consent . United National Insurance Co answer due 12/8/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/18/2022. (crt,Bunting, M)
November 17, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, with consent by United National Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Andrews, Erica)
November 17, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, with consent . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Bunting, M)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/15/2022. (crt,Jones, P)
November 10, 2022 Filing 5 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/10/2022. (crt,Bunting, M)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 9/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Additional Neutrals)(crt,Bunting, M)
November 10, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by United National Insurance Company. (aty,Andrews, Erica)
November 10, 2022 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United National Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Global Indemnity Limited for United National Insurance Company. (aty,Andrews, Erica)
November 10, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2022-4216 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5363416) filed by United National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 14th JDC Petition)(Attorney Erica L Andrews added to party United National Insurance Company(pty:dft))(aty,Andrews, Erica)
November 10, 2022 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Bunting, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alston v. United National Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Represented By: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Cade Richard Cole
Represented By: Cade Richard Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Alston
Represented By: Somer Brown
Represented By: Jackson Thomas Ritchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United National Insurance Co
Represented By: Erica L Andrews
Represented By: Ann Marie LeBlanc
Represented By: Kathryn Montez Caraway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?