Willis et al v. Camping World R V Sales L L C et al
Plaintiff: LINDA EAVES WILLIS and TOMMY WILLIS
Defendant: Winnebago Industries, Inc., Camping World RV Sales, LLC d/b/a Camping World RV Sales, Camping World R V Sales L L C, Winnebago Industries Inc and Southwest R V Centers L L C misnamed as Camping World R V Sales L L C doing business as Camping Wolrd R V Supercenter doing business as Camping World R V Sales
Case Number: 2:2023cv00122
Filed: January 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2023 REMARK: A duplicate charge was incurred during the filing of the #1 Notice of Removal. Per the attorney's request, a refund of the initial payment of $402.00, Receipt #ALAWDC-5436762, has been processed in pay.gov this date. Counsel is advised to verify the refund on their statement. (crt,McInnis, S)
March 2, 2023 DISTRICT COURT TRANSFER Record Received electronically by Southern District of Texas on 3/2/2023, assigned case number 4:23-cv-00785. (crt,Alexander, E)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #4 Motion to Transfer Case; denying #4 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter be transferred to the SouthernDistrict of Texas. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 3/2/2023. (crt,Whitener, M)
March 2, 2023 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from Western District of Louisiana to Southern District of Texas. Case Terminated. All future pleadings should be filed with the newly assigned court. (crt,Whitener, M)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 2/23/2023. (crt,Jones, P)
February 23, 2023 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case and, alternatively, MOTION to Dismiss, filed filed by Camping World R V Sales L L C, Southwest R V Centers L L C, Winnebago Industries Inc. (aty,Beasley, Kyle)
February 16, 2023 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case and, alternatively, MOTION to Dismiss, filed filed by Linda Eaves Willis, Tommy Willis. (aty,Iles, Randall)
February 2, 2023 Filing 9 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Camping World R V Sales L L C, Southwest R V Centers L L C. (aty,Beasley, Kyle)
February 2, 2023 Filing 8 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Winnebago Industries Inc. (aty,Beasley, Kyle)
February 2, 2023 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Camping World R V Sales L L C, Southwest R V Centers L L C, Winnebago Industries Inc consisting of a list of all documents in state court record with certificate and copies of all records. (aty,Beasley, Kyle)
January 30, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Kyle Matthew Beasley on behalf of Southwest R V Centers L L C, Winnebago Industries Inc. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 2/13/2023. (crt,Whidden, C)
January 30, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #4 MOTION to Transfer Case and, alternatively, MOTION to Dismiss, filed. Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. Motion day set for 3/29/2023 before Judge James D Cain Jr. (crt,Whitener, M)
January 30, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Transfer Case and MOTION to Dismiss by Camping World R V Sales L L C, Southwest R V Centers L L C, Winnebago Industries Inc. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Purchase Agreement)(aty,Beasley, Kyle). Added MOTION to Dismiss on 1/30/2023 (Whitener, M).
January 26, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Southwest R V Centers L L C, Winnebago Industries Inc. (aty,Beasley, Kyle) (Main Document 3 replaced on 1/26/2023) (Crick, S).
January 26, 2023 Filing 2 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/26/2023. (crt,Crick, S)
January 26, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 36th JDC Beauregard Parish, Case Number C-2022-0922-B (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5436833) filed by Winnebago Industries Inc, Southwest R V Centers L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition filed by Plaintiffs in state court proceedings, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of removal filed in state court proceedings, #3 Affidavit of attorney Kyle Beasley, #4 Certificate of filing in state court and notice to adverse parties, #5 Rule 7.1 Disclosure for Defendant Southwest RV Centers, LLC, #6 Rule 7.1 Disclosure for Defendant Winnebago Industries, Inc.)(Attorney Kyle Matthew Beasley added to party Southwest R V Centers L L C, Winnebago Industries Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,Beasley, Kyle) Modified on 1/26/2023 to modify filers and modify docket text and to indicate attorney contacted by instant mail to request civil cover sheet. (Crick, S). Modified on 1/26/2023 to indicate #3 Civil Cover Sheet submitted. (Crick, S).
January 26, 2023 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Winnebago Industries Inc answer due 2/2/2023. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found at Attachment #1 to #1 Notice of Removal. (crt,Crick, S)
January 26, 2023 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Crick, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willis et al v. Camping World R V Sales L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA EAVES WILLIS
Represented By: Randall Scott Iles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOMMY WILLIS
Represented By: Randall Scott Iles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winnebago Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camping World RV Sales, LLC d/b/a Camping World RV Sales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camping World R V Sales L L C
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winnebago Industries Inc
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest R V Centers L L C misnamed as Camping World R V Sales L L C doing business as Camping Wolrd R V Supercenter doing business as Camping World R V Sales
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?