Savoie et al v. Occidental Petroleum Corp et al
Plaintiff: Robert Savoie, Freda Guidry, Jeffery Boudreaux, Brenda Boudreaux, Leslie Russell Welch, Yancy Welch, Benjamin Welch, Jr, Chris Landry and Kirk Landry
Defendant: Occidental Petroleum Corp, Anadarko E & P Onshore L L C, Union Pacific Resources Co, Reliable Production Service Inc, Reliable Production Service L L C, Hilcorp Energy Co, Texas Petroleum Investment Co, Pioneer Exploration L L C and Prayer Oil & Gas Production L L C
Case Number: 2:2024cv00340
Filed: March 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Thomas P LeBlanc
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #10 Amended Complaint. Anadarko E & P Onshore L L C answer due 5/29/2024; Occidental Petroleum Corp answer due 5/29/2024; Union Pacific Resources Co answer due 5/29/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 4/29/2024. (crt,Jones, P)
April 26, 2024 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Anadarko E & P Onshore L L C, Occidental Petroleum Corp, Union Pacific Resources Co. (aty,Smith, Meghan)
April 26, 2024 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robert Savoie. Hilcorp Energy Co waiver sent on 4/4/2024, answer due 6/3/2024. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. Party waiving service, date of mailing and answer due date not entered/calculated at time of electronic filing. (crt,Crick, S) Modified on 4/26/2024 to add document number.(Crick, S).
April 23, 2024 Filing 20 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Texas Petroleum Investment Co. (aty,Guidry, Valerie)
April 23, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #18 Corporate Disclosure Statement sent to Valerie Vige Guidry on behalf of Texas Petroleum Investment Co. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 5/7/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
April 22, 2024 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Texas Petroleum Investment Co (Attorney Valerie Vige Guidry added to party Texas Petroleum Investment Co(pty:dft)). (aty,Guidry, Valerie)
April 22, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by Anadarko E & P Onshore L L C, Occidental Petroleum Corp, Union Pacific Resources Co. Motions referred to Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/22/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Smith, Meghan)
April 8, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #15 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. (crt,Crick, S)
April 5, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. Motions referred to Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/5/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,Veron, J). Added MOTION for Attorney Fees on 4/8/2024 (Crick, S).
April 5, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of List of Attorneys Involved in the Case by Anadarko E & P Onshore L L C, Occidental Petroleum Corp, Union Pacific Resources Co re #6 Removal Order (aty,Smith, Meghan)
April 5, 2024 Filing 13 Response to Removal Order by Counsel by Anadarko E & P Onshore L L C, Occidental Petroleum Corp, Union Pacific Resources Co re #6 Removal Order (aty,Smith, Meghan) Modified on 4/5/2024 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
April 1, 2024 Filing 12 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hilcorp Energy Co, Pioneer Exploration L L C, Prayer Oil & Gas Production L L C, Reliable Production Service L L C, Texas Petroleum Investment Co. (crt,Crick, S)
April 1, 2024 Filing 11 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brenda Boudreaux, Jeffery Boudreaux, Freda Guidry, Chris Landry, Kirk Landry, Leslie Russell Welch, Robert Savoie, Benjamin Welch, Jr, Yancy Welch. (aty,Veron, J)
April 1, 2024 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hilcorp Energy Co, TEXAS PETROLUM INVESTMENT COMPANY, Pioneer Exploration L L C, PRAYER OIL & GAS PRODUCTION, LLC filed by Yancy Welch, Jeffery Boudreaux, Benjamin Welch, Jr, Kirk Landry, Freda Guidry, Chris Landry, Brenda Boudreaux, Robert Savoie, Leslie Russell Welch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,Veron, J)
March 20, 2024 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Anadarko E & P Onshore L L C, Occidental Petroleum Corp, Union Pacific Resources Co identifying other affiliates, Anadarko Consolidated Holdings L L C, O X Y U S A W T P L P, Occidental Permian Manager L L C, O X Y U S A Inc, Occidental Petroleum Corp, Berkshire Hathaway Inc, for Anadarko E & P Onshore L L C; other affiliates, R M E Petroleum Co, Anadarko E & P Co L P, Anadarko E & P Onshore L L C for Union Pacific Resources; other affiliate, Berkshire Hathaway Inc for Occidental Petroleum Corp. (aty,Smith, Meghan) Modified on 3/21/2024 to add other affiliates and modify docket text. (Crick, S).
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Anadarko E & P Onshore L L C answer due 4/29/2024; Occidental Petroleum Corp answer due 4/29/2024; Union Pacific Resources Co answer due 4/29/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 3/14/2024. (crt,Jones, P)
March 11, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, with consent by Anadarko E & P Onshore L L C, Occidental Petroleum Corp, Union Pacific Resources Co. Motions referred to Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/11/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Smith, Meghan)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 3/7/2024. (crt,Jones, P)
March 6, 2024 Filing 5 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT for Robert L Savoie, Freda Guidry, Jeffery Boudreaux, Brenda Boudreaux, Leslie Russell Welch, Yancy Welch, Benjamin Welch, Jr., Chris Landry, Kirk Landry, Occidental Petroleum Corp, Anadarko E & P Onshore L L C, Union Pacific Resources Co by Anadarko E & P Onshore L L C, Occidental Petroleum Corp, Union Pacific Resources Co. (aty,Anada, Tarak) Modified on 3/7/2024 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
March 6, 2024 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/6/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
March 6, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Tarak Anada, J Michael Veron on behalf of Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC, Brenda Boudreaux, Jeffery Boudreaux, Freda Guidry, Chris Landry, Kirk Landry, Occidental Petroleum Corp, Leslie Russell Welch, Robert Savoie, Union Pacific Resources Co, Benjamin Welch, Jr, Yancy Welch. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 3/20/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
March 6, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Tarak Anada on behalf of Anadarko E & P Onshore L L C, Occidental Petroleum Corp, Union Pacific Resources Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 3/20/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
March 6, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 38th JDC Cameron Parish, Case Number 10-21049 (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-5876404) filed by Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC, Union Pacific Resources Company, Occidental Petroleum Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Record)(Attorney Tarak Anada added to party Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Tarak Anada added to party Occidental Petroleum Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Tarak Anada added to party Union Pacific Resources Company(pty:dft))(aty,Anada, Tarak)
March 6, 2024 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC answer due 3/13/2024; Occidental Petroleum Corporation answer due 3/13/2024; Reliable Production Service Inc answer due 3/13/2024; Union Pacific Resources Company answer due 3/13/2024. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found at Attachment #2 to #1 Notice of Removal. (crt,Crick, S)
March 6, 2024 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. (crt,Crick, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Savoie et al v. Occidental Petroleum Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Savoie
Represented By: J Michael Veron
Represented By: Gage Michael Stewart
Represented By: Patrick Jody Lavergne
Represented By: Peyton Frances Pawlicki
Represented By: Shayna Lynn Sonnier
Represented By: Turner Duvall Brumby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freda Guidry
Represented By: J Michael Veron
Represented By: Gage Michael Stewart
Represented By: Patrick Jody Lavergne
Represented By: Peyton Frances Pawlicki
Represented By: Shayna Lynn Sonnier
Represented By: Turner Duvall Brumby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Boudreaux
Represented By: J Michael Veron
Represented By: Gage Michael Stewart
Represented By: Patrick Jody Lavergne
Represented By: Peyton Frances Pawlicki
Represented By: Shayna Lynn Sonnier
Represented By: Turner Duvall Brumby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Boudreaux
Represented By: J Michael Veron
Represented By: Gage Michael Stewart
Represented By: Patrick Jody Lavergne
Represented By: Peyton Frances Pawlicki
Represented By: Shayna Lynn Sonnier
Represented By: Turner Duvall Brumby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Russell Welch
Represented By: J Michael Veron
Represented By: Gage Michael Stewart
Represented By: Patrick Jody Lavergne
Represented By: Peyton Frances Pawlicki
Represented By: Shayna Lynn Sonnier
Represented By: Turner Duvall Brumby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yancy Welch
Represented By: J Michael Veron
Represented By: Gage Michael Stewart
Represented By: Patrick Jody Lavergne
Represented By: Peyton Frances Pawlicki
Represented By: Shayna Lynn Sonnier
Represented By: Turner Duvall Brumby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Welch, Jr
Represented By: J Michael Veron
Represented By: Gage Michael Stewart
Represented By: Patrick Jody Lavergne
Represented By: Peyton Frances Pawlicki
Represented By: Shayna Lynn Sonnier
Represented By: Turner Duvall Brumby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Landry
Represented By: J Michael Veron
Represented By: Gage Michael Stewart
Represented By: Patrick Jody Lavergne
Represented By: Peyton Frances Pawlicki
Represented By: Shayna Lynn Sonnier
Represented By: Turner Duvall Brumby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk Landry
Represented By: J Michael Veron
Represented By: Gage Michael Stewart
Represented By: Patrick Jody Lavergne
Represented By: Peyton Frances Pawlicki
Represented By: Shayna Lynn Sonnier
Represented By: Turner Duvall Brumby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occidental Petroleum Corp
Represented By: Tarak Anada
Represented By: Edward H Bergin
Represented By: Eric Phillip Morvant
Represented By: Meghan Elizabeth Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anadarko E & P Onshore L L C
Represented By: Tarak Anada
Represented By: Edward H Bergin
Represented By: Eric Phillip Morvant
Represented By: Meghan Elizabeth Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Resources Co
Represented By: Tarak Anada
Represented By: Edward H Bergin
Represented By: Eric Phillip Morvant
Represented By: Meghan Elizabeth Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliable Production Service Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliable Production Service L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilcorp Energy Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Petroleum Investment Co
Represented By: William H L Kaufman
Represented By: David K McCrory
Represented By: Valerie Vige Guidry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Exploration L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prayer Oil & Gas Production L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?