Roy v. Franklin Parish Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Troy Miguel Roy
Defendant: Franklin Parish Detention Center, Gerald McMurray and Kirk Deruen
Case Number: 3:2009cv01677
Filed: September 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Monroe Office
County: Franklin
Presiding Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 JUDGMENT ADOPTING 26 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that 24 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Sheriff of Franklin Parish, Gerald McMurray is GRANTED, and all remaining claims in this civil action are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Robert G James on 4/20/11. (crt,Crawford, A)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 JUDGMENT ADOPTING 11 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Plaintiff's claims against defendants FRANKLIN PARISH DETENTION CENTER and KIRK DEROUEN be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous. Plaintiff's civil rights complaint otherwise remains pending before the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Robert G James on 3/23/10. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Troy Miguel Roy, RECOMMENDING that the complaint against Franklin Parish Detention Center and Kirk Derouen be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous. Objections to R&R due by 3/1/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 2/11/10. (crt,Crawford, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roy v. Franklin Parish Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Miguel Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin Parish Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald McMurray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Deruen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?