Brown v. Hill et al
Plaintiff: Terrance T Brown
Defendant: Matt Hill, Ellen Eade and George Britton
Case Number: 3:2009cv02170
Filed: December 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Monroe Office
County: Ouachita
Presiding Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 JUDGMENT ADOPTING 68 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the Motion for Summary Judgment 57 filed by Defendants Royce Tony, Sheriff of Ouachita Parish; Deputy Shannon Harkins; Deputy Matt Hill; Deputy James Hindman; Deputy Larry Knight; and Deputy Larry Ludlow, is hereby GRANTED. For the reasons stated in the Report and Recommendation, Plaintiff Terrance T. Brown's Complaint 1 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to all Defendants. Signed by Chief Judge Robert G James on 1/14/11. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by James Hindmon, Matt Hill, Shannon Harkins, Royce Toney, Larry Knight, Larry Ludlow, RECOMMENDING the motion be GRANTED, and plaintiff's claims against said defendants be dis missed with prejudice. In addition, and for the same reasons, it is RECOMMENDED that plaintiff's claims against the only remaining defendant, George Britton, also be dismissed. Objections to R&R due by 12/13/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 11/23/10. (crt,Crawford, A)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 RULING re 40 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re 38 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion for Default Judgment and 54 MOTION for Leave to Appeal filed by Terrance T Brown. Signed by Chief Judge Robert G James on 9/24/10. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 JUDGMENT adopting 47 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendant Ellen Eade's 21 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED, and Plaintiff's claims against this Defendant are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Robert G James on 9/15/10. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Hill et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance T Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Eade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Britton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?