Exco Operating Company LP v. Arnold et al

Plaintiff: Exco Operating Co L P
Defendant: Evelyn Arnold, Pearl Dedman Wylie Baldwin Estate, Etta Jackson Blackwell, Edith Turner Blanchard, Robert J Bozeman, Dandra Evette Bradford, Roderick James Bradford, Florence Leonard Bryant, Audrey Turner Burns, Theodore Arnold, Big Sky Mineral Trust, Connie Jo Cole Blakely, Mary Calahan Blankenship, Berkita Shuntae Bradford, Mary C Bradford, Brenda R Gordan, Irene Leonard Bryant, J'Lyshae G Burns and James Earl Burns
Case Number: 3:2010cv01838
Filed: December 14, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Jackson
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2014 258 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 254 Report and Recommendations, IT IS ORDERED that 232 motion be GRANTED IN PART, and that Exco Operating Co LP be awarded fees and costs totaling $10,591.93, to be paid by the Clerk of Court out of the funds deposited in the registry of the court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion 232 otherwise be DENIED. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 9/18/2014. (crt,Joffrion, B)
May 21, 2014 242 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER deferring ruling on 232 Motion for Attorney Fees. Within the next 14 days, EXCO shall supplement its motion for fees and costs with a memorandum and contemporaneous time sheets and billing/cost records that conform to the fees and costs that the court intends to allow, as detailed herein. EXCO may file the revised attorney time sheets/billing records under seal, but, in any event, shall serve a copy of the revised sheets/records on counsel for defendants, Evelyn Spillers, et al. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within 14 days after EXCO supplements its motion, defendants, Evelyn Arnold, et al., shall file any response thereto. EXCO may seek leave to file a reply within 7 days thereafter. ORDER granting 233 Motion to file exhibits under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 5/20/14. (crt,Crawford, A)
September 6, 2013 216 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING; adopting as modified Report and Recommendations re 197 Report and Recommendations, IT IS ORDERED that the clerk is directed to return the funds held in the registry of the Court to Exco. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Exco shall di sburse the registry funds in accordance with the "Total Interest" column of the spreadsheet appended to the Special Master's Report and Recommendation and the forgoing Order. The clerk is instructed to close this matter. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 8/30/2013. A copy of this order is sent to Financial.(crt,Joffrion, B)
December 2, 2011 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 78 Motion to Compel. Within 30 calendar days from the date of this order, EXCO shall supplement its responses to Turner's discovery requests in accordance with the opinion herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 12/02/11. (crt,Yocum, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Exco Operating Company LP v. Arnold et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Exco Operating Co L P
Represented By: Glenn L Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evelyn Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pearl Dedman Wylie Baldwin Estate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Etta Jackson Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edith Turner Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J Bozeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dandra Evette Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roderick James Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florence Leonard Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audrey Turner Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Sky Mineral Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Jo Cole Blakely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Calahan Blankenship
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkita Shuntae Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary C Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda R Gordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irene Leonard Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J'Lyshae G Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Earl Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?