Hudleston v. Rin Tin Tin Inc et al

Plaintiff: LaFreida Hudleston
Defendant: Rin Tin Tin Inc and Daphne Hereford
Counter_claimant: Rin Tin Tin Inc and Daphne Hereford
Counter_defendant: LaFreida Hudleston
Case Number: 3:2011cv01427
Filed: August 3, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Acadia
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 4, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 39 Motion for Reconsideration of 33 MOTION for Geordie Duckler to Appear Pro Hac Vice , filed by LaFreida Hudleston. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 1/4/12. (crt,Crawford, A)
September 28, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 12 Report and Recommendations re 4 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Rin Tin Tin Inc and Daphne Hereford. IT IS ORDERED that defendant's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and the Plaintiff's claims against defendant Daphne Hereford are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Rin Tin Tin Inc remain pending for trial. Signed by Chief Judge Robert G James on 09/26/11. (crt,Yocum, M) Modified text on 9/28/2011 (Yocum, M).
September 19, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING DENYING 13 MOTION to Remand and Memorandum Law in Support filed by LaFreida Hudleston. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 9/19/11. (crt,DickersonSld, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudleston v. Rin Tin Tin Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Rin Tin Tin Inc
Represented By: Edwin L Hightower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Daphne Hereford
Represented By: Edwin L Hightower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: LaFreida Hudleston
Represented By: Richard L Fewell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaFreida Hudleston
Represented By: Richard L Fewell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rin Tin Tin Inc
Represented By: Edwin L Hightower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daphne Hereford
Represented By: Edwin L Hightower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?