Luv N Care Ltd v. Angel Juvenile Products

Plaintiff: Luv N Care Ltd
Defendant: Angel Juvenile Products
Case Number: 3:2011cv01878
Filed: October 24, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Ouachita
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2015 161 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM RULING re 138 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Luv N Care Ltd, 119 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Lerado Group (Holding) Co Ltd, Peaceful Trust Co Ltd, Lerado Group Ltd, Lerado Overseas Ltd, Angel Juvenile Products, Angel Juvenile Products Zhong Shan Co Ltd, Lerado China Ltd, 118 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal filed by Lerado Group (Holding) Co Ltd, Lerado Group Ltd, Lerado Overseas Ltd, Lerado China Ltd. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 9/14/2015. (crt,Bunting, M)
June 9, 2015 150 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 138 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Luv N Care Ltd, 119 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Lerado Group (Holding) Co Ltd, Peaceful Trust Co Ltd, Lerado Group Ltd, Lerado Oversea s Ltd, Angel Juvenile Products, Angel Juvenile Products Zhong Shan Co Ltd, Lerado China Ltd, 145 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Lerado Group (Holding) Co Ltd, Peaceful Trust Co Ltd, Lerado Group Ltd, Lerado Overseas Lt d, Angel Juvenile Products, Angel Juvenile Products Zhong Shan Co Ltd, Lerado China Ltd, 118 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal filed by Lerado Group (Holding) Co Ltd, Lerado Group Ltd, Lerado Overseas Ltd, Lerado China Ltd. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 6/8/2015. (crt,Bunting, M)
September 5, 2013 83 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 65 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Lerado Group (Holding) Co Ltd, Lerado Group Ltd. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 9/5/13. (crt,Roaix, G)
November 29, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING denying 8 Motion to Remand. IT IS ORDERED that the motion to remand filed by plaintiff Luv N' Care Ltd is hereby DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's associated request for costs, expenses, and fees is likewise DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 11/29/11. (crt,Yocum, M)
November 18, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 1 Notice of Removal filed by Angel Juvenile Products. The Notice of Removal does not affirmatively allege plaintiff's principal place of business. Accordingly, within the next seven days from the date of this order, defendant is granted leave of court to file an amended notice of removal which establishes diversity jurisdiction. If defendant fails to so comply, or if subject matter jurisdiction is found to be lacking, then the matter will be remanded to state court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 11/18/11. (crt,Yocum, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luv N Care Ltd v. Angel Juvenile Products
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luv N Care Ltd
Represented By: Joseph D Guerriero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angel Juvenile Products
Represented By: Sidney Earl Cook, Jr
Represented By: Jason Blance Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?