Spillers et al v. Chevron U S A Inc et al

Plaintiff: Nicholas Wade Spillers, Lindsay Marie Spillers, Bobbie June Staples, P D S Lands L L C, Carney W Potter, Lyle Thomas Lewis, Janet Sue Lewis, Charles M Spillers L L C, Charles Milton Spillers and Teresa Delaine Woodard Spiller
Defendant: Chevron U S A Inc, G P M Inc of Oklahoma, Marathon Oil Co, Nadel & Gussman-Jetta Operating Co, Koch Midstream Services Co L L C, Union Oil Co of California, Marathon Petroleum Co L P, Mosaic Global Holdings Inc, Kaiser Francis Oil Co, Samson Resources Co and River Bend Energy Corp
Case Number: 3:2011cv02163
Filed: December 16, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Ouachita
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM RULING re 19 MOTION to Remand filed by Lindsay Marie Spillers, Nicholas Wade Spillers, Carney W Potter, Teresa Delaine Woodard Spiller, Lyle Thomas Lewis, P D S Lands L L C, Charles M Spillers L L C, Bobbie June Staples, Janet Sue Lewis, Charles Milton Spillers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 8/6/013. (crt,Crawford, A)
March 6, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 42 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision; granting 44 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision re 40 Memorandum Ruling and 41 Judgment on Motion to Remand. This matter is hereby REMANDED to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings consistent with the terms of the instant Memorandum Order. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 3/6/2013. (crt,Dauterive, C)
August 2, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING GRANTING 19 MOTION to Remand filed by Union Oil Co of California, Chevron U S A Inc and DENYING 25 MOTION to Strike Exhibit 6, Affidavit of Greg Miller re 19 MOTION to Remand filed by Lindsay Mari e Spillers, Nicholas Wade Spillers, Carney W Potter, Teresa Delaine Woodard Spiller, Lyle Thomas Lewis, P D S Lands L L C, Charles M Spillers L L C, Bobbie June Staples, Janet Sue Lewis, Charles Milton Spillers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 8/2/12. (crt,Crawford, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spillers et al v. Chevron U S A Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Wade Spillers
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: John S Dupont, III
Represented By: Ross J Donnes
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, Jr
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsay Marie Spillers
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: John S Dupont, III
Represented By: Ross J Donnes
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, Jr
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbie June Staples
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, Jr
Represented By: Ross J Donnes
Represented By: John S Dupont, III
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P D S Lands L L C
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, Jr
Represented By: Ross J Donnes
Represented By: John S Dupont, III
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carney W Potter
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, Jr
Represented By: Ross J Donnes
Represented By: John S Dupont, III
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyle Thomas Lewis
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, Jr
Represented By: Ross J Donnes
Represented By: John S Dupont, III
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Sue Lewis
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, Jr
Represented By: Ross J Donnes
Represented By: John S Dupont, III
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles M Spillers L L C
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, Jr
Represented By: Ross J Donnes
Represented By: John S Dupont, III
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Milton Spillers
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, Jr
Represented By: Ross J Donnes
Represented By: John S Dupont, III
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Delaine Woodard Spiller
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, Jr
Represented By: Ross J Donnes
Represented By: John S Dupont, III
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U S A Inc
Represented By: Alan J Berteau
Represented By: Louis V Gregoire, Jr
Represented By: Louis Matthew Grossman
Represented By: Charles S McCowan, III
Represented By: Michael R Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G P M Inc of Oklahoma
Represented By: Paul M Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Oil Co
Represented By: Phillip W DeVilbiss
Represented By: Richard E Gerard, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nadel & Gussman-Jetta Operating Co
Represented By: Paul M Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koch Midstream Services Co L L C
Represented By: Madeline Ahlgren
Represented By: Andrew J Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Oil Co of California
Represented By: Alan J Berteau
Represented By: Louis V Gregoire, Jr
Represented By: Louis Matthew Grossman
Represented By: Charles S McCowan, III
Represented By: Michael R Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Co L P
Represented By: Phillip W DeVilbiss
Represented By: Richard E Gerard, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mosaic Global Holdings Inc
Represented By: Vance A Gibbs
Represented By: John F Jakuback
Represented By: Mark A Marionneaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Francis Oil Co
Represented By: George H Robinson, Jr
Represented By: Stuart Theron Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samson Resources Co
Represented By: George Arceneaux, III
Represented By: April Leigh Rolen-Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: River Bend Energy Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?