Denton v. Foster Farms Delaware, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Michael Denton and Pamela Denton
Defendant: Foster Farms Delaware Inc and Gary Surles
Case Number: 3:2012cv00328
Filed: January 31, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Union
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2014 96 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING GRANTING IN PART 67 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Foster Poultry Farms. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 1/6/14. (crt,Crawford, A)
October 31, 2013 90 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 68 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Danny Adams and Thomas Wiberg filed by Foster Poultry Farms. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 10/31/13. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
September 11, 2013 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 58 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' August 13, 2013 Expert Report filed by Foster Poultry Farms. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 9/11/13. (crt,Crawford, A) (Main Document 65 replaced on 9/11/2013 to correct typographical error) Ruling re-noticed to counsel(Crawford, A). Modified on 9/11/2013 (Crawford, A).
October 16, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 35 Report and Recommendations granting 27 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Emotional Distress and Fear of Disease Claims. Plaintiffs' claims for emotional distress and fear of contracting a a disease are hereby DISMISSED. Signed by Chief Judge Robert G James on 10/15/12. (crt,Crawford, A)
August 23, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING SUPERSEDING Report and Recommendation re 5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. IT IS ORDERED that the Motion is hereby DENIED AS MOOT. In light of Plaintiffs' substitution of the proper Defendant in their Amend ed Complaint 23 , the Clerk of Court is instructed to remove Foster Farms Delaware, Inc., and Gary Surles as Defendants in this matter because they are not named Defendants in the Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Robert G James on 8/23/12. (crt,DickersonSld, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Denton v. Foster Farms Delaware, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Denton
Represented By: Johnny R Huckabay, II
Represented By: Robert M Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Denton
Represented By: Robert M Baldwin
Represented By: Johnny R Huckabay, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Farms Delaware Inc
Represented By: Boyd A Bryan
Represented By: Christopher D Martin
Represented By: James C Percy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Surles
Represented By: Boyd A Bryan
Represented By: Christopher D Martin
Represented By: James C Percy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?