Johnston & Johnston v. Conseco Life Insurance Co

Plaintiff: Johnston & Johnston
Defendant: Conseco Life Insurance Co
Case Number: 3:2012cv01552
Filed: June 7, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Ouachita
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 16, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 44 MOTION for Entry of Judgment re 43 USCA Judgment, filed by Conseco Life Insurance Co and 45 Bill of Costs filed by Conseco Life Insurance Co. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 1/16/14. (crt,Crawford, A)
December 13, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 31 MOTION to Alter Judgment (or Amend) filed by Conseco Life Insurance Co. Defendant's Motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 12/13/12. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
October 11, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING GRANTING 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Johnston & Johnston and DENYING 6 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION for Summary Judgment in the Alternative filed by Conseco Life Insurance Co,. Signed by Chief Judge Robert G James on 10/11/12. (crt,Crawford, A)
October 3, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Accordingly, within the next seven (7) days from the date of this order, plaintiff is granted leave of court to file an amended complaint that establishes diversity jurisdiction. See 28 U.S.C. 1653. If plaintiff fail to so comply, or if jurisdiction is found to be lacking, the dismissal will be recommended. Fed.R.Civ.P.12(h)(3). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 10/3/12. (crt,DickersonSld, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnston & Johnston v. Conseco Life Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnston & Johnston
Represented By: George Adam Cossey
Represented By: Charles W Herold, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conseco Life Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?