Webb v. St. Joseph et al

Plaintiff: Ivan Webb
Defendant: Town of St Joseph and Edward L Brown
Case Number: 3:2012cv02644
Filed: October 4, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Tensas
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: James T Trimble
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2017 93 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT DENYING 66 Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's claims are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; GRANTING 67 Motion for Summary Judgment; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, in light of the Court's ruling on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, Plaintiffs Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision 70 is hereby MOOT. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 3/7/17. (crt,Keller, J)
May 9, 2016 86 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER re 82 Suggestion of Death, 84 Response (NOT Motions), 85 Response (NOT Motions). It is ORDERED that counsel of record for the decedent, J Arthur Smith III, file a declaration on the record within 14 days from the date of this order. Failure to file this declaration may result in appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 5/9/16. (crt,Keller, J)
February 17, 2016 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED within 30 days of the date of this order, defendants provide proof that service of the 82 Suggestion of Death has been made in accordance with the requirements of Rules 4 & 25, or to notify the court in writing regarding its efforts to make such service; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED this matter be STAYED until a plaintiff is substituted or the proper time period for such substitution has lapsed. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 2/17/2016. (crt,Putch, A)
June 8, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 52 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within 7 days from the date of this order, defendants file their answer to the complaint, as amended. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 6/4/15. (crt,Crawford, A)
April 23, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying, without prejudice, 53 Motion for Order Finding Karl Koch in Contempt of Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 04/23/2015. (crt,Yocum, M)
June 11, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 5 Motion to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim and For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, 35 Supplemental Motion to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Edward L Brown, Town of St Joseph. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 06/11/13. (crt,Guillot, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb v. St. Joseph et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of St Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward L Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Webb
Represented By: J Arthur Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?