Williams v. Johnson

Plaintiff: Lawrence Williams
Defendant: Antonio Johnson
Case Number: 3:2013cv00478
Filed: March 5, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Madison
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 61 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge; DENYING 56 Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings; DISMISSING Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Without Prejudice; and, DENYING 60 Motion for transfer and compensatory damages. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 11/21/14. (crt,Crawford, A)
July 14, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 52 Motion for production of video footage and a means to view it. By Friday, July 18, 2014, defendant shall provide plaintiff with a copy of the video footage from the respective camera(s) for the entir e length of each day that he intends to introduce into evidence, together with the means for Williams to view the footage. Otherwise the motion is DENIED. ORDER granting 53 Motion to Amend/Correct Hearing Witness List. The writs of habeas corpu s ad testificandum, previously issued for Terry Folse, Sr. and Anthony Freeman are hereby RECALLED. FURTHER ORDERED that writs of habeas corpus ad testificandum issue to the Warden of Madison Parish Detention Center for the appearance of Zenas Fruge' and Cortney Plumbar at the evidentiary hearing of July 22, 2014.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 7/14/14. (crt,Crawford, A)
May 22, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 40 Report and Recommendation regarding 30 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS ORDERED that the Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc. No. 30] filed by Defendant Antonio Johnson is hereby DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this mat ter is referred to the assigned magistrate judge to hold an evidentiary hearing (to include all witnesses and evidence to be presented by all parties) and, thereafter, to issue findings to the Court, via report and recommendation. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 5/22/14. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
April 30, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 38 Motion for Reconsideration of 36 Order on Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 04/30/2014. (crt,Yocum, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?