Dixon v. Home Depot U S A Inc et al

Plaintiff: Daniel L Dixon
Defendant: Home Depot U S A Inc, Techtronic Industries Co Ltd, Techtronic Industries North America Inc, One World Technologies Inc and Ryobi Technologies Inc
Case Number: 3:2013cv02776
Filed: September 27, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2015 156 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 96 Third MOTION in Limine (Prohibit Remarks or Argument to the Effect that Defendants Were Obligated to Design, Manufacture, and Sell a "Better" or "Safer" Saw or the "Best" or "Safest" Possible Saw) filed by Home Depot U S A Inc, Ryobi Technologies Inc, One World Technologies Inc, Techtronic Industries North America Inc. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 7/20/15. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
June 16, 2015 146 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 94 First MOTION in Limine (Bar Reference to CPSC Data/Reports of Other Purportedly Similar Incidents) filed by Home Depot U S A Inc, Ryobi Technologies Inc, One World Technologies Inc, Techtronic Industries North Americ a Inc, and 98 Fifth MOTION in Limine (Bar Reference to Alleged Defective Conditions in the Subject BTS 12S that Did Not Cause or Contribute to Plaintiff's Accident) filed by Home Depot U S A Inc, Ryobi Technologies Inc, One World Technologies Inc, Techtronic Industries North America Inc. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 6/16/15. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
June 10, 2015 132 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 89 First MOTION in Limine To Exclude Attacks on Plaintiff's Counsel and Allegations of Conspiracy filed by Daniel L Dixon. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 6/10/15. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
May 13, 2015 129 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 75 MOTION in Limine to exclude Plaintiff's experts, Darry Robert Holt and Stephen Gass filed by Home Depot U S A Inc, Ryobi Technologies Inc, One World Technologies Inc, and Techtronic Industries North America Inc, 76 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Home Depot U S A Inc, Ryobi Technologies Inc, One World Technologies Inc, and Techtronic Industries North America Inc, and 99 Sixth MOTION in Limine (Exclude Testimony of Stephen Gass) filed by Home Depot U S A Inc, Ryobi Technologies Inc, One World Technologies Inc, and Techtronic Industries North America Inc. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 5/13/15. (crt,DickersonSld, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. Home Depot U S A Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel L Dixon
Represented By: Robert A Breithaupt
Represented By: John Kenneth Chapman
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Richard J Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U S A Inc
Represented By: Charles H Abbott
Represented By: J Chandler Bailey
Represented By: Haley A Cox
Represented By: Byron D Kitchens
Represented By: Edward McDowell Newsom
Represented By: Adam K Peck
Represented By: John G Thompson, Jr
Represented By: Christopher Cameron Yearout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Techtronic Industries Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Techtronic Industries North America Inc
Represented By: Charles H Abbott
Represented By: J Chandler Bailey
Represented By: Haley A Cox
Represented By: Byron D Kitchens
Represented By: Edward McDowell Newsom
Represented By: Adam K Peck
Represented By: John G Thompson, Jr
Represented By: Christopher Cameron Yearout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One World Technologies Inc
Represented By: Charles H Abbott
Represented By: J Chandler Bailey
Represented By: Haley A Cox
Represented By: Byron D Kitchens
Represented By: Edward McDowell Newsom
Represented By: Adam K Peck
Represented By: John G Thompson, Jr
Represented By: Christopher Cameron Yearout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryobi Technologies Inc
Represented By: Charles H Abbott
Represented By: J Chandler Bailey
Represented By: Haley A Cox
Represented By: Byron D Kitchens
Represented By: Edward McDowell Newsom
Represented By: Adam K Peck
Represented By: John G Thompson, Jr
Represented By: Christopher Cameron Yearout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?