Tabor v Madison Parish Hospital Service District et al

Plaintiff: Barbara Tabor
Defendant: Madison Parish Hospital Service District, Johnny Ford, Scott Barrilleaux, Sandra Smith, James D Caldwell, Thomas Joe Williams and Tom Bartholomew
Case Number: 3:2014cv02374
Filed: July 24, 2014
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Madison
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2017 140 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 114 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Madison Parish Hospital Service District. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 6/13/2017. (crt,Crawford, A)
June 13, 2016 93 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 90 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Signed by Judge Robert G James on 6/13/16. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
February 5, 2016 87 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The Report and Recommendation 69 of the Magistrate Judge having been considered, no objections thereto having been filed, and finding that same is supported by the law and the record in this matter, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the Rule 12(c) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Filed on Behalf of Defendants Johnny Ford, Sandra Smith, Tom Bartholomew, and Scott Barrilleaux [Doc. No. 41] is hereby GRANTED, and Plaintiffs claims against said Defendants are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 2/5/16. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
October 30, 2015 66 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 27 Report and Recommendation. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the 23 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED, and Plaintiffs claims against Defendant James D. Buddy Caldwell areDISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 10/30/15. (crt,Crawford, A)
September 14, 2015 54 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 49 Report and Recommendation. Denying 36 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 9/14/15. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
August 6, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 36 Motion for Sanctions, to the following extent, IT IS ORDERED that within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff Barbara Tabor and her counsel, shall remit the single sum of $500 to defendants, Madison Parish Hospital Service District, et al, within 7 days thereafter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the alternative motion for sanctions is otherwise DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 8/6/15. (crt,Crawford, A)
April 13, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT adopting 20 Report and Recommendation, granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion to Dismiss. To the extent that Defendant sought dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 17(b)(1), the motion is GRANTED, and Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Thomas Joe Williams are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The motion is otherwise DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 4/13/15. (crt,DickersonSld, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tabor v Madison Parish Hospital Service District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Tabor
Represented By: Richard L Fewell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison Parish Hospital Service District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Barrilleaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James D Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Joe Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Bartholomew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?