Union Pacific Railroad Co v. Taylor Truck Line Inc et al

Plaintiff: Union Pacific Railroad Co
Defendant: Taylor Truck Line Inc, Taylor Logistics Inc, Daniel A Shackleford and College City Leasing L L C
Case Number: 3:2015cv00074
Filed: January 14, 2015
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Morehouse
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2017 363 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 209 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability filed by Union Pacific Railroad Co. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 9/29/2017. (crt,Crawford, A)
September 20, 2017 361 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 192 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Taylor Consolidated Inc, Taylor Logistics Inc, Daniel Shackleford, Taylor Truck Line Inc, College City Leasing L L C. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 9/20/2017. (crt,Crawford, A)
September 13, 2017 360 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 348 Motion for New Trial and/or to Alter or Amend Judgment and/or in the Alternative, for Relief under Rule 60 and/or for Clarification of Ruling and Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 9/13/2017. (crt,Crawford, A)
August 3, 2017 346 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 184 Alternative MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Prewett Enterprises Inc, 197 Alternative MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Taylor Logistics Inc, Daniel Shackleford, Taylor Truck Line Inc, College City Leasing L L C, and 205 Alternative MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Union Pacific Railroad Co. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 8/3/2017. (crt,Crawford, A)
July 14, 2017 345 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 323 Motion for New Trial, or in the Alternative, for Relief Under Rule 60 on the Issue of Past and Future Loss of Revenue from Anticipated Expansion of Builders Supply re 321 Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 7/14/2017. (crt,YocumSld, M)
July 13, 2017 343 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 190 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on the Issue of Preemption of Liability for Additional Signs or Signalization at the Crossing filed by Union Pacific Railroad Co. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 7/13/2017. (crt,YocumSld, M)
June 1, 2017 325 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 294 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 6/1/2017. (crt,Crawford, A)
May 17, 2017 320 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 181 , 185 , 196 , and 208 Motions for Partial Summary Judgment on claims brought by R & L Properties of Oak Grove LLC and R & L Builders Supply Inc, filed by Prewett Enterprises Inc, Hulcher Services Inc, College City Leasing LLC, Daniel Shackleford, Taylor Logistics Inc, Taylor Truck Line LLC, Taylor Consolidated Inc, and Union Pacific Railroad Co. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 5/17/2017. (crt,Crawford, A)
May 9, 2017 306 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 189 , 195 , 199 , and 207 MOTIONS for Partial Summary Judgment re loss of lease payments asserted by R & L Properties of Oak Grove L L C and R & L Builders Supply Inc based on the expansion of the Builder Supply business. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 5/9/2017. (crt,Crawford, A)
May 2, 2017 296 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 183 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On the Issue of Trespass filed by Prewett Enterprises Inc, 193 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On the Issue of Tresspass filed by Hulcher Services Inc and 204 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Issue of Trespass filed by Union Pacific Railroad Co. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 5/2/2017. (crt,Crawford, A)
April 20, 2017 292 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 182 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding the Lack of Evidence filed by Prewett Enterprises Inc and 187 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Hulcher Services Inc. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 4/20/2017. (crt,Crawford, A)
March 8, 2017 291 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 236 Motion to Compel and for attorney fees; denying 237 Motion to Compel and for attorney fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 3/8/17. (crt,Crawford, A)
March 1, 2017 289 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 188 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Allegations of Inadequate Training of the Train Crew filed by Union Pacific Railroad Co. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 3/1/17. (crt,Crawford, A)
February 27, 2017 287 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 125 MOTION for Summary Judgment to Dismiss All Claims Brought by R & L Builders Supply Inc filed by Prewett Enterprises Inc, 132 MOTION for Summary Judgment to Dismiss All Claims Brought by R&L Builders (M ember3:15-cv-2460) filed by Union Pacific Railroad Co, 141 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Hulcher Services Inc, and 160 MOTION for Summary Judgment to Dismiss All Claims Brought by R&L Builders Supply, Inc. filed by Taylor Consolidated Inc, Taylor Logistics Inc, Daniel Shackleford, Taylor Truck Line Inc, College City Leasing L L C. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 2/27/17. (crt,Crawford, A)
December 28, 2016 269 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 256 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that 134 and 149 Motions to Dismiss filed by Robert G Taylor Trust and Robert G Taylor, as trustee of the Robert G Taylor Trust are GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Union Pacific Railroad Co, R&L Builders Supply Inc, and R&L Properties of Oak Grove's claims against the Robert G Taylor Trust are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Union Pacific Railroad Co, R&L Builders Su pply Inc, and R&L Properties of Oak Grove's claims against Robert G Taylor, as trustee of the Robert G Taylor Trust, are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The motions are otherwise DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that [1 43] and 145 Motions to Dismiss filed by Robert G Taylor, individually, are GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Union Pacific Railroad Co, R&L Builders Supply Inc, and R&L Properties of Oak Grove's claims against Robert G Taylor individually, are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The motions are otherwise DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 12/28/16. (crt,Crawford, A)
May 29, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: For the reasons set forth in this Court's Ruling 34 and for those additional reasons in the 16 Report and Recommendation, to the extent adopted, and after a de novo review of the record, including Defendants' objections and Plaintiff's response to objections, IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Compel Joinder 6 , is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 5/29/15. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
May 1, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: In response to court order 20 , plaintiff filed an amended complaint 21 to clarify deficient allegations of citizenship. Upon review of the amended pleading, the court finds that plaintiff's jurisdictional allegations now suffice to establish diversity jurisdiction. 28 USC 1332. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 5/1/15. (crt,DickersonSld, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Union Pacific Railroad Co v. Taylor Truck Line Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Truck Line Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Logistics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel A Shackleford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: College City Leasing L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union Pacific Railroad Co
Represented By: Kevin M Dills
Represented By: Kyle L Gideon
Represented By: John E McElligott, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?