Walter v. Bullock et al

Plaintiff: Kristen Walter
Defendant: Jason Bullock and J P S Aviation L L C
Case Number: 3:2015cv01938
Filed: June 22, 2015
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Acadia
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 7, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For the reasons stated in the 48 Report and Recommendations and determining that the findings are correct; IT IS ORDERED that 48 Motion to Tax Attorneys Fees be and is hereby GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Attorney's fees are hereby awarded to Defendant J P S Aviation L L C against Plaintiff Kristen Walker in the amount of $1,645.00. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 7/7/2017. (crt,Putch, A)
January 10, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 19 SECOND MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by J P S Aviation L L C, Jason Bullock, 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by J P S Aviation L L C, Jason Bullock. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 01/10/2017. (crt,McDonnell, D)
September 22, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 4 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim for which relief can be granted against Jason Bullock filed by Jason Bullock. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 09/22/2016. (crt,McDonnell, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walter v. Bullock et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Walter
Represented By: Kelly N Clay
Represented By: Wendy E W Giovingo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J P S Aviation L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?