Simpson et al v. Dollar Tree Stores Inc

Plaintiff: Susan Simpson and Jerry Simpson
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores Inc
Case Number: 3:2015cv02107
Filed: July 28, 2015
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Ouachita
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 23, 2017 47 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 34 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Dollar Tree Stores Inc. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 3/23/17. (crt,Crawford, A)
September 21, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 7 Motion to Remand; denying 7 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 9/21/15. (crt,Crawford, A)
September 11, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 1 Notice of Removal filed by Dollar Tree Stores Inc. Removing defendant is granted leave of court to file an amended notice of removal that establishes diversity jurisdiction within seven (7) days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 09/11/2015. (crt,Yocum, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpson et al v. Dollar Tree Stores Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Simpson
Represented By: Allan Lee Placke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Simpson
Represented By: Allan Lee Placke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores Inc
Represented By: Amanda Huling Aucoin
Represented By: Lisa Ann McLachlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?