Johnson v. Bastrop et al

Plaintiff: Archie Johnson
Defendant: City of Bastrop and Maximilan Hollins
Case Number: 3:2015cv02463
Filed: October 2, 2015
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Morehouse
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2017 79 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 66 MOTION For Contempt of Court filed by Archie Johnson and 73 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Archie Johnson. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 8/3/2017. (crt,Crawford, A)
January 20, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 37 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law or Motion to Vacate or Alter Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 1/20/17. (crt,Crawford, A)
December 6, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Archie Johnson, and 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Maximilan Hollins, City of Bastrop. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 12/6/16. (crt,DickersonSld, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Bastrop et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Archie Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Bastrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maximilan Hollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?