Payne v. Seterus Inc

Plaintiff: Robert Charles Payne, Jr
Defendant: Seterus Inc
Case Number: 3:2016cv00203
Filed: February 12, 2016
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Ouachita
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1640
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2017 50 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING denying 48 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 6/26/2017. (crt,Crawford, A)
October 26, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 28 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Seterus Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 10/26/16. (crt,Crawford, A)
August 26, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING provisionally granting 8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within the next fourteen (14) days from the date of this ruling, plaintiff may seek leave of court to file an amended complaint to redress his deficient allegations as detailed herein. If no motion is filed within this fourteen (14) day period, then the court will enter judgment in accordance with the ruling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 8/26/16. (crt,DickersonSld, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payne v. Seterus Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seterus Inc
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Charles Payne, Jr
Represented By: Michael G Renneisen
Represented By: James A Rountree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?